EP3630922 - LIQUID-CRYSTAL MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2020/15] | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTEK, Michael Elisabethenstrasse 16 64390 Erzhausen / DE | 02 /
KLASS, Dagmar Schmelzerweg 41 64291 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18728094.6 | 28.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018EP63868 | Priority number, date | DE20171005413 | 30.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017005413 | [2020/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018219841 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630922 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3630922 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/30, C09K19/12, C09K19/34, C09K19/18, C09K19/04 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
C09K19/3003 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/12 (EP,KR);
C09K19/18 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/3066 (EP,US);
C09K19/34 (EP,KR);
C09K19/3455 (EP,KR);
C09K19/3491 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/00 (KR);
F21S43/00 (KR);
C09K2019/0448 (EP,KR);
C09K2019/0466 (US);
C09K2019/122 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/123 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/181 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3004 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3009 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/301 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3016 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3021 (EP,KR);
C09K2019/3025 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2019/3027 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/15] | C09K19/30, C09K19/34, C09K19/12, C09K19/18, C09K19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINES MEDIUM | [2020/15] | English: | LIQUID-CRYSTAL MEDIUM | [2020/15] | French: | MILIEU CRISTAL LIQUIDE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 26.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 31.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 16.11.2022 | CZ | 16.11.2022 | DK | 16.11.2022 | EE | 16.11.2022 | ES | 16.11.2022 | FI | 16.11.2022 | HR | 16.11.2022 | IT | 16.11.2022 | LT | 16.11.2022 | LV | 16.11.2022 | MC | 16.11.2022 | NL | 16.11.2022 | PL | 16.11.2022 | RO | 16.11.2022 | RS | 16.11.2022 | SE | 16.11.2022 | SI | 16.11.2022 | SK | 16.11.2022 | SM | 16.11.2022 | NO | 16.02.2023 | GR | 17.02.2023 | IS | 16.03.2023 | PT | 16.03.2023 | AT | 28.05.2023 | GB | 28.05.2023 | IE | 28.05.2023 | LU | 28.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
IT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
GB | 28.05.2023 | ||
IE | 28.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
GB | 28.05.2023 | ||
IE | 28.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
IE | 28.05.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
MC | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
LU | 28.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SI | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SK | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 16.11.2022 | |
CZ | 16.11.2022 | ||
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 16.11.2022 | |
DK | 16.11.2022 | ||
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RO | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 16.11.2022 | |
EE | 16.11.2022 | ||
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 16.11.2022 | |
ES | 16.11.2022 | ||
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
SM | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
NL | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
HR | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
PL | 16.11.2022 | ||
RS | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
IS | 16.03.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
LV | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
GR | 17.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 16.11.2022 | |
FI | 16.11.2022 | ||
LT | 16.11.2022 | ||
SE | 16.11.2022 | ||
NO | 16.02.2023 | ||
PT | 16.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 16.11.2022 | |
NO | 16.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]EP2801601 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,14 * paragraph [0001]; claim - * [A] 4,5,10-12 [I] 3,7; | [XAI]US2015123032 (SUDO GO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,14 * paragraph [0001]; claim - * [A] 4,5,10-12 [I] 3,7; | [XAI]EP2937342 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-9,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0088] - [0094]; claim - * [A] 4,5,10-12 [I] 2; | [A]WO2016146245 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * examples M8, M102, M103, M216-M219, M329; claim - *; | [A]DE102016011899 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14* example -; claim - * | Examination | US2013135575 | WO2017013981 | by applicant | DE2209127 | DE2338281 | DE2240864 | DE2321632 | DE2450088 | DE2637430 | DE2853728 | US4985816 | DE19910004 | DE102013113807 | DE102016011899 | - TOGASHI, S.; SEKOGUCHI, K.; TANABE, H.; YAMAMOTO, E.; SORIMACHI, K.; TAJIMA, E.; WATANABE, H.; SHIMIZU, H., "Matrix LCD Controlled by Double Stage Diode Rings", Proc. Eurodisplay 84, (19840900), vol. A 210-28, page 141 ff | - STROMER, M., "Design of Thin Film Transistors for Matrix Addressing of Television Liquid Crystal Displays", Proc. Eurodisplay, (19840900), vol. 84, page 145 ff | - H.K. BAIK et al., Langmuir, (20050000), vol. 21, pages 11079 - 11084 | - J.B.KIM et al., Adv. Mater., (20080000), vol. 20, pages 3073 - 3078 | - M.F. SCHIECKEL; K. FAHRENSCHON, "Deformation of nematic liquid crystals with vertical orientation in electrical fields", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19710000), vol. 19, page 3912 | - J.F. KAHN, Appl. Phys. Lett., (19720000), vol. 20, page 1193 | - G. LABRUNIE; J. ROBERT, J. Appl. Phys., (19730000), vol. 44, page 4869 | - J. ROBERT; F. CLERC, SID 80 Digest Techn. Papers, (19800000), page 30 | - J. DUCHENE, Displays, (19860000), vol. 7, page 3 | - H. SCHAD, SID 82 Digest Techn. Papers, (19820000), page 244 | - YOSHIDE, H. et al., "Vortrag 3.1: ''MVA LCD for Notebook or Mobile PCs ...", International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, (20040000), vol. XXXV, pages S. 6 - 9 | - LIU, C.T. et al., "Vortrag 15.1: ''A 46-inch TFT-LCD HDTV Technnology ...", International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, (20040000), vol. XXXV, pages S. 750 - 753 | - KIM, SANG SOO, "Vortrag 15.4: ''Super PVA Sets New State-of-the-Art for LCD-TV", International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, (20040000), vol. XXXV, XP007011838 | - SHIGETA, MITZUHIRO; FUKUOKA, HIROFUMI, "Vortrag 15.2: ''Development of High Quality LCDTV", International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, (20040000), vol. XXXV | - YEO, S.D., "Vortrag 15.3: ''A LC Display for the TV Application", International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, (20040000), vol. XXXV | - MILLER, LAN, "Seminar M-7: ''LCD-Television", Seminar Lecture Notes, (20040000), pages M-7,1 - M-7,32 | - HALLER et al., Mol. Cryst. Liq. Cryst., (19730000), vol. 24, pages 249 - 258 |