EP3619856 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST (HARQ) FEEDBACK PERFORMANCE OF ENHANCED MOBILE BROADBAND (EMBB) WHEN IMPACTED BY LOW LATENCY TRAFFIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states IDAC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, Delaware 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINI, Ananth 1001 E. Hector Street Suite 300 Conshohocken, Pennsylvania 19428 / US | 02 /
HOSSEINIAN, Seyed Mohsen 6641 Elegante Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2020/11] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/11] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18728275.1 | 02.05.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018US30639 | Priority number, date | US201762500938P | 03.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762500938 P | US201762519372P | 14.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762519372 P | US201762543047P | 09.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762543047 P | US201862615744P | 10.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862615744 P | [2020/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018204491 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3619856 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/18 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H04L1/1864 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/16 (RU);
H04L1/1621 (KR);
H04L1/1607 (EP,CN);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (CN,US);
H04L43/06 (US);
H04L43/0823 (US);
H04L5/0055 (CN,US);
H04W72/23 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER RÜCKKOPPLUNGSLEISTUNG EINER HYBRIDEN AUTOMATISCHEN WIEDERHOLUNGSANFRAGE (HARQ) EINES ERWEITERTEN MOBILBREITBANDES (EMBB) UNTER EINFLUSS VON VERKEHR MIT NIEDRIGER LATENZ | [2020/11] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING HYBRID AUTOMATIC REPEAT REQUEST (HARQ) FEEDBACK PERFORMANCE OF ENHANCED MOBILE BROADBAND (EMBB) WHEN IMPACTED BY LOW LATENCY TRAFFIC | [2020/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AMÉLIORER LES PERFORMANCES DE RÉTROACTION DE DEMANDE AUTOMATIQUE DE RÉPÉTITION HYBRIDE (HARQ) DE LA LARGE BANDE MOBILE AMÉLIORÉE (EMBB) LORSQU'ELLE EST TOUCHÉE PAR UN TRAFIC À FAIBLE LATENCE | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 01.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2413627 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0052] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0078] ** figures 6A-6D, 7 *; | [XI] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on CB group based HARQ operation", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1704916 NR CBG HARQ_FINAL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051243051 [X] 1-4,8-14,18-20 * the whole document * [I] 5-7,15-17 | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "Overview of CBG-based retransmission in NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1705401 - OVERVIEW OF CBG-BASED RETRANSMISSION IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FR, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051243531 [X] 1-6,8-16,18-20 * the whole document * [I] 7,17 |