EP3630220 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Straße 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WABEL, Peter Chopinweg 12 64287 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18728358.5 | 30.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018EP64134 | Priority number, date | DE201710111803 | 30.05.2017 Original published format: DE102017111803 | [2020/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018219981 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630220 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3630220 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28, A61M1/16, G01G21/22, G01G23/37, G01G19/387 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
A61M1/287 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/1656 (KR);
A61M1/166 (KR);
G01G21/22 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/15 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/273 (KR);
A61M2205/3334 (KR);
A61M2205/3393 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/36 (US);
A61M2205/3653 (EP,KR);
A61M2205/502 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/702 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2209/08 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PERITONEALDIALYSELÖSUNG | [2020/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SOLUTION | [2020/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SOLUTION DE DIALYSE PÉRITONÉALE | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 17.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | AT | 30.05.2023 | IE | 30.05.2023 | LU | 30.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 30.05.2023 | ||
LU | 30.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
IE | 30.05.2023 | ||
LU | 30.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
LU | 30.05.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4585436 (DAVIS RALPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,14,16,17,19,20 * column 3, line 25 - line 65 * * column 6, line 10 - line 68 * * figure 1 * [I] 10,13,15; | [XI]EP0619135 (S I F RA SOCIETA ITALIANA FARM [IT]) [X] 1-3,5,6,12,14,16,19,20 * column 2, line 37 - column 9, line 28 * * figures 1,7 * [I] 4,15,17; | [XI]WO9520985 (GAMBRO AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,14,16-18,20 * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 19 * * page 10, line 13 - line 21 * * page 10, line l - page 11, line 7 * * page 11, line 28 - line 35 * * figures 1-3 *[I] 19; | [XI]WO2016087043 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,14,16,20 * page 4, paragraph 7 - page 5, line 3, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 6 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 4 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [I] 4,6,15,17,19 |