EP3791625 - USER DEVICE BASED HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASOOMZADEH-FARD, Ali 19 Bluebird Ln. Marlboro, New Jersey 07746 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Tai-Ann 47 Brookside Ave. Livingston, New Jersey 07039 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 18728519.2 | 08.05.2018 | [2021/11] | WO2018EP61832 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019214806 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791625 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/36, H04W16/28, H04W72/04, H04W36/08 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04W36/085 (EP,US);
H04W36/362 (EP,US);
H04W72/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | AUF BENUTZERGERÄTEN BASIERENDE ÜBERGABE | [2021/11] | English: | USER DEVICE BASED HANDOVER | [2021/11] | French: | TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE BASÉ SUR UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 08.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017055187 (KANG HYUN-JEONG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2017208494 (MOON JUNGMIN [KR], et al); | [Y]US2017311217 (JUNG HYEJUNG [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017196223 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) |