EP3616171 - METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING DEPOSIT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polysecure GmbH Sankt-Georgener Str. 19, Geb. 23 79111 Freiburg / DE | [2021/12] |
Former [2020/10] | For all designated states Polysecure GmbH Engesserstrasse 4a 79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÖSSLEIN, Jochen Lise-Meitner-Strasse 15 79100 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
KATUS, Philip Merzhauser Str. 8 79100 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
KIRCHENBAUER, Daniel Am Kupferacker 10 79283 Bollschweil / DE | 04 /
FAHR, Martin August-Bebel-Str. 53 03130 Felixsee / DE | 05 /
RICHTE, Christian Geranienweg 7 85238 Petershausen / DE | 06 /
GALFE, Günther Florastrasse 16 81827 München / DE | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Erbacher, Martin Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 18729022.6 | 24.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018DE100394 | Priority number, date | DE201710108641 | 24.04.2017 Original published format: DE102017108641 | [2020/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018196921 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616171 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3616171 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3616171 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/06 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
G07F7/0609 (EP);
G01N21/6408 (US);
G06Q30/0185 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON PFANDGUT | [2020/10] | English: | METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING DEPOSIT MATERIAL | [2020/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION DE LA MARCHANDISE EN CONSIGNATION | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 14.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2021
04.05.2022
WITHDRAWN Sensor-Instruments Entwicklungs- und Vertriebs-GmbH Schlinding 11 94169 Thurmansbang / DE Opponent's representative Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2021
25.11.2021
ADMISSIBLE Sensor-Instruments Entwicklungs- und Vertriebs-GmbH Schlinding 11 94169 Thurmansbang / DE Opponent's representative Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | 08.12.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.04.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.06.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.10.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2018 | AL | 24.02.2021 | CY | 24.02.2021 | CZ | 24.02.2021 | DK | 24.02.2021 | EE | 24.02.2021 | ES | 24.02.2021 | FI | 24.02.2021 | HR | 24.02.2021 | IT | 24.02.2021 | LT | 24.02.2021 | LV | 24.02.2021 | MC | 24.02.2021 | MK | 24.02.2021 | MT | 24.02.2021 | NL | 24.02.2021 | PL | 24.02.2021 | RO | 24.02.2021 | RS | 24.02.2021 | SE | 24.02.2021 | SI | 24.02.2021 | SK | 24.02.2021 | SM | 24.02.2021 | IE | 24.04.2021 | LU | 24.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | BG | 24.05.2021 | NO | 24.05.2021 | GR | 25.05.2021 | IS | 24.06.2021 | PT | 24.06.2021 | AT | 24.04.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/35] | HU | 24.04.2018 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
AT | 24.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | HU | 24.04.2018 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
MK | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 24.04.2018 | |
AL | 24.02.2021 | ||
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CY | 24.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
IT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
IE | 24.04.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SI | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
ES | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 24.02.2021 | |
CZ | 24.02.2021 | ||
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
LU | 24.04.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
MC | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RO | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SK | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
DK | 24.02.2021 | ||
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 24.02.2021 | |
EE | 24.02.2021 | ||
FI | 24.02.2021 | ||
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
SM | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
IS | 24.06.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
PL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
NL | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
SE | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
LV | 24.02.2021 | ||
RS | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
BG | 24.05.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
GR | 25.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
HR | 24.02.2021 | ||
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 24.02.2021 | |
LT | 24.02.2021 | ||
NO | 24.05.2021 | ||
PT | 24.06.2021 | Cited in | Opposition | DE4231477 | EP1158459 | EP1235191 | US2005178841 | DE102004016249 |