EP3606898 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HYDROQUINONE AND CATECHOL, METHOD FOR PREPARING THESE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPECIALTY OPERATIONS FRANCE 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/28] | For all designated states RHODIA OPERATIONS 9 rue des Cuirassiers Immeuble Silex 2 Solvay 69003 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 25 rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAREL, Laurent 16 rue des Tuiliers 69003 Lyon / FR | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Valentino, Cédric Specialty Operations France IAM 85 avenue des Frères Perret 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | [2024/40] |
Former [2020/07] | Mross, Stefan P.M. Solvay SA Intellectual Assets Management RIC Lyon 85 avenue des Frères Perret, BP 62 69182 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 18729153.9 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018EP65463 | Priority number, date | FR20170055272 | 13.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1755272 | [2020/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018229033 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606898 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606898 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C39/06, C07C39/08 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
C07C37/60 (EP,US);
C07C39/06 (US);
C07C15/085 (US);
C07C39/08 (US);
C07C43/205 (US);
C07C2529/89 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/60, C07C39/06 (EP);
C07C37/60, C07C39/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, HYDROCHINON UND CATECHOL UMFASSEND, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESER ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2020/07] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HYDROQUINONE AND CATECHOL, METHOD FOR PREPARING THESE COMPOSITIONS | [2020/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DE L'HYDROQUINONE ET DU CATECHOL, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CES COMPOSITIONS | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 07.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US5426244 (SUGAI RYUJI [JP], et al); | [ID]WO9802500 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) | by applicant | FR2071464 | FR2489816 | US4410501 | US5426244 | WO9802500 | EP1123159 | EP1131264 | FR2856681 | EP3048091 |