EP3630445 - CONTINUOUS FORMATION OF TUBES OF POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE AND COPOLYMERS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tepha, Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue, Suite 360 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANATRA, Amit 31 Connor Court Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | 02 /
RIZK, Said 72 Heritage Hill Road Windham, NH 03087 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18729290.9 | 18.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US33420 | Priority number, date | US201762511069P | 25.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762511069 P | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018217574 | Date: | 29.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3630445 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3630445 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/09, B29C48/88, B29C55/24, A61M25/10, // C08L67/04, B29B13/06, A61L29/16 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A61M25/0009 (EP,US);
A61L29/02 (US);
A61L29/043 (US);
A61L29/045 (US);
A61L29/049 (US);
A61L29/06 (EP,US);
A61L29/148 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L29/18 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/18 (EP,US);
A61N5/1001 (US);
B29B13/045 (EP,US);
B29B13/065 (EP,US);
B29C48/0018 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/802 (EP,US);
B29C48/902 (EP,US);
B29C48/903 (EP,US);
B29C48/905 (EP,US);
B29C48/9115 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C55/24 (EP,US);
C08J5/00 (US);
A61L2300/112 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US);
A61L2300/44 (EP,US);
A61L2300/442 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0205 (EP,US);
A61M2207/00 (EP,US);
A61M25/0108 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92152 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92447 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/006 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7542 (US);
C08J2367/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L29/06, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2020/15] | B29C47/88, B29C47/90, B29C47/92, A61M25/10, B29C55/24, A61L31/16, C08L67/04, B29B13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHE HERSTELLUNG VON ROHREN AUS POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRAT UND COPOLYMEREN DAVON | [2020/15] | English: | CONTINUOUS FORMATION OF TUBES OF POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE AND COPOLYMERS THEREOF | [2020/15] | French: | FORMATION CONTINUE DE TUBES EN POLY-4-HYDROXYBUTYRATE ET SES COPOLYMÈRES | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 19.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | IE | 18.05.2023 | LU | 18.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 18.05.2023 | ||
LU | 18.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 18.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 18.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 30.11.2022 | |
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3456044 (PAHLKE HEINZ ERICH) [A] 1-6,8,11-19 * see reference from WO2008/013699 A1 (cf. page 11, line 31) * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US6214283 (VISSCHER JAN [NL], et al) [Y] 2-6 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]WO2008013699 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * page 1, line 10 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 6 * * page 9, lines 6-29 * * page 11, lines 30-33 * * see reference to US3,456,044 in line 31 on page 11 * [I] 8,11,15,17; | [XYI]US2012271396 (ZHENG XIAOXIA [US], et al) [X] 1,12,14-19 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0279] * [Y] 2-6 [I] 8,11,13; | [A]WO2014045068 (ARTERIUS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6,8,11,14,16 * abstract * * claims 1-58 ** figures 1-11 * | by applicant | US5811272 | WO9932536 | WO0056376 | US6245537 | US6316262 | US6323010 | US6548569 | US6555123 | US6585994 | US6610764 | US6623748 | WO2004101002 | US6828357 | US6838493 | US6867247 | US6867248 | US6878758 | WO2006015276 | US7025980 | US7179883 | US7244442 | US2007182041 | WO2007092417 | US7268205 | US7553923 | US7618448 | US7641825 | US8016883 | WO2011119742 | US8034270 | US8039237 | WO2011159784 | WO2012064526 | US8231889 | US8287909 | US2014100649 | - STEINBIICHEL A. et al., "Diversity of Bacterial Polyhydroxyalkanoic Acids", FEMS Microbial. Lett., (19950000), vol. 128, pages 219 - 228 | - HORI, Y. et al., Polymer, (19950000), vol. 36, pages 4703 - 4705 | - HOUK, K.N. et al., J. Org. Chem., (20080000), vol. 73, no. 7, pages 2674 - 2678 | - MOORE, T. et al., Biomaterials, (20050000), vol. 26, pages 3771 - 3782 | - WILLIAMS, S.F. et al., Polyesters, (20020000), vol. 111, no. 4, pages 91 - 127 | - MARTIN, D. et al., "Medical Applications of Poly-4-hydroxybutyrate: A Strong Flexible Absorbable Biomaterial", Biochem. Eng. J., (20030000), vol. 16, pages 97 - 105 |