EP3638223 - BROMHEXINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kern, Kai-Uwe Welschstr. 40 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Oetke, Cornelia Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18729456.6 | 13.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018EP65646 | Priority number, date | EP20170176379 | 16.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17176379 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018229119 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3638223 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3638223 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/32, A61P29/02, A61P43/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K47/12 (EP);
A61K47/14 (EP);
A61K47/32 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/17] | A61K31/137, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61P29/02, A61P43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | BROMHEXIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN | [2023/02] | English: | BROMHEXINE FOR THE TREATMENT OF PAIN | [2020/17] | French: | BROMHEXINE DESTINÉ AU TRAITEMENT DES DOULEURS | [2023/02] |
Former [2020/17] | BROMHEXIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON SCHMERZEN | ||
Former [2020/17] | BROMHEXINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA DOULEUR | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 10.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 25.10.2023 | [2024/33] | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4191780 (TOSI CARLO [IT]); | [I]WO0205815 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al); | [X]WO2005094832 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al); | [X]JP2006124381 (DAIICHI SEIYAKU CO); |