EP3618989 - SUCTION DEVICE FOR ADDITIVE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTT, Michael Kuhlendahl 127B 45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 02 /
RULE, David Strelitzer Str. 72 10115 Berlin / DE | [2020/11] | Application number, filing date | 18730302.9 | 04.06.2018 | [2020/11] | WO2018EP64566 | Priority number, date | DE201710210718 | 26.06.2017 Original published format: DE102017210718 | [2020/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019001900 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3618989 | Date: | 11.03.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B29C64/153 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
B29C64/371 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F10/322 (EP,US);
B22F12/224 (EP,US);
B22F12/70 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B22F2201/10 (EP);
B22F2999/00 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B33Y50/02 (US);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F12/70, B22F2201/10 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/11] | Title | German: | ABSAUGVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ADDITIVE FERTIGUNG | [2020/11] | English: | SUCTION DEVICE FOR ADDITIVE PRODUCTION | [2020/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASPIRATION DESTINÉ À LA FABRICATION ADDITIVE | [2020/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/11] | 02.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004031881 (CONCEPT LASER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] *; | [XI]WO2014199150 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 14 * * page 14, line 22 - page 15, line 4 * * claims 1-44 * * figures 1-15 * [I] 4-7,9; | [A]DE102013011676 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-9* claims 1-14 *; | [A]DE102013215377 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0011] - [0013] - [0018] , [0019] *; | [XI]DE102014209161 (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0040] , [0049] * * claims 1-15 * * figures 1-10 * [I] 4-6,9; | [A]WO2015181772 (PRIMA IND SPA [IT]) [A] 9 * page 14, line 12 - page 15, line 6 * | by applicant | EP2601006 |