EP3596591 - DEVICES, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR SEAMLESS TRANSITION OF USER INTERFACE BEHAVIORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKIN, Brandon, M. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
KARUNAMUNI, Chanaka, G. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
GORBIK, Dmitry, A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
ALONSO RUIZ, Marcos One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
DE VRIES, Nathan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
CERRA, Joseph, P. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 07 /
RUDEL, Emanuele One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2024/40] |
Former [2020/04] | 01 /
WALKIN, Brandon, M. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
KURUNAMUNI, Chanaka, G. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
GORBIK, Dmitry, A. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
ALONSO RUIZ, Marcos One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
05 /
DE VRIES, Nathan One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
CERRA, Joseph, P. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
07 /
RUDEL, Emanuele One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [2020/04] | Application number, filing date | 18730531.3 | 16.05.2018 | [2020/04] | WO2018US32882 | Priority number, date | US201762507184P | 16.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762507184 P | DK2017PA70375 | 24.05.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770375 | US201715841229 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: US201715841229 | [2020/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018213387 | Date: | 22.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3596591 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3596591 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0487, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0486, G06F3/0488 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0484 (CN);
G06F3/04845 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/0487 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06T13/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND GRAFISCHE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHEN FÜR DEN NAHTLOSEN ÜBERGANG VON BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHENVERHALTEN | [2020/04] | English: | DEVICES, METHODS, AND GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACES FOR SEAMLESS TRANSITION OF USER INTERFACE BEHAVIORS | [2020/04] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, PROCÉDÉS ET INTERFACES UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUES POUR UNE TRANSITION FLUIDE DE COMPORTEMENTS D'INTERFACE UTILISATEUR | [2020/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/04] | 17.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2023 | 07.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24197223.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP1674977 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [I]US2007150830 (ORDING BAS [US], et al); | [A]EP2413228 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [I]EP2750016 (SONY MOBILE COMM AB [SE]) |