|
13.10.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2022 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
08.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
08.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Description |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2020 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2020 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2020 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
137 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
20.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
74 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
136 |