Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11396670 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | B2 | US2022090159 | 24.03.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916624616 | 19.12.2019 | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | US202117464991 | 02.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11130979 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2021 | B2 | US2020123584 | 23.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102638505B | Global Dossier | 20.02.2024 | B1 | KR20200019731 | 24.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7282693B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2023 | B2 | JP2020530260 | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL271404 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4026908 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18730809 | 20.06.2018 | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111032871 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3064037 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018286919B | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | B2 | AU2018286919 | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3642343 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2021 | B1 | EP3642343 | 29.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019027397 | 14.07.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3642343T | 14.03.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2906997T | 21.04.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | WO2018EP66344 | 20.06.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018234349 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17176932 | 20.06.2017 | Type | Divisional application | EP4026908 |