EP3642078 - A HAUL TRUCK BODY AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HAUL TRUCK BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Outotec Sweden AB Box 132 231 22 Trelleborg / SE | [2021/13] |
Former [2020/18] | For all designated states Metso Sweden AB Box 132 231 22 Trelleborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Fredrik Sigtunagatan 14 214 29 Malmö / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Henrik Lillevångsvägen 17 231 68 Trelleborg / SE | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 665 831 27 Östersund / SE | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18731151.9 | 21.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018EP66682 | Priority number, date | EP20170177442 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17177442 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234514 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642078 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3642078 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/28, B60R13/01 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
B60P1/286 (EP,US);
B60R13/01 (EP,US);
B60P1/28 (RU);
B62D33/02 (RU);
B60R2013/016 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTWAGENAUFBAU UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES LASTWAGENAUFBAUS | [2020/18] | English: | A HAUL TRUCK BODY AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A HAUL TRUCK BODY | [2020/18] | French: | CARROSSERIE DE CAMION DE TRANSPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARROSSERIE DE CAMION DE TRANSPORT | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/18] | CARROSSERIE DE CAMION DE ROULAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARROSSERIE DE CAMION DE ROULAGE | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 18.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2018 | AL | 23.12.2020 | CY | 23.12.2020 | CZ | 23.12.2020 | DK | 23.12.2020 | EE | 23.12.2020 | HR | 23.12.2020 | IT | 23.12.2020 | LT | 23.12.2020 | LV | 23.12.2020 | MC | 23.12.2020 | MK | 23.12.2020 | MT | 23.12.2020 | PL | 23.12.2020 | RO | 23.12.2020 | SI | 23.12.2020 | SK | 23.12.2020 | SM | 23.12.2020 | BG | 23.03.2021 | GR | 24.03.2021 | IS | 23.04.2021 | PT | 23.04.2021 | IE | 21.06.2021 | LU | 21.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 21.06.2018 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
MK | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 21.06.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.06.2018 | |
AL | 23.12.2020 | ||
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 21.06.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CY | 23.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 21.06.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 21.06.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
IE | 21.06.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SI | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
MC | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
DK | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
IT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.12.2020 | |
CZ | 23.12.2020 | ||
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
IS | 23.04.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
PL | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
EE | 23.12.2020 | ||
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 23.12.2020 | |
HR | 23.12.2020 | ||
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
RO | 23.12.2020 | ||
SK | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LT | 23.12.2020 | ||
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
PT | 23.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
SM | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 23.12.2020 | |
LV | 23.12.2020 | ||
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 23.12.2020 | |
BG | 23.03.2021 | ||
GR | 24.03.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3897972 (LOGUE GEORGE E) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, lines 59-68 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-7,10-13; | [A]US4592583 (DRESEN WILLIAM L [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US4826233 (HAGENBUCH LEROY G [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 24 * * figures 1, 4, 6 *; | [A]US2013069417 (WINK JAMES W [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0098] - [0115] * * figures 10-12 *; | [Y]US2015061311 (NATARAJAN YAGNESHWAR [IN], et al) [Y] 2-7,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0 24] , [0 25] ** figures 1-3 * |