EP3631766 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR RENDERING VIRTUAL REALITY CONTENT BASED ON TWO-DIMENSIONAL ("2D") CAPTURED IMAGERY OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL ("3D") SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verizon Patent and Licensing Inc. One Verizon Way Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [2020/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LODATO, Michael 11 Ivins Dr. New Egypt, New Jersey 08533 / US | 02 /
SEPULVEDA, Rene 8529 Oak Pointe Way Fairfax Station, Virginia 22039 / US | 03 /
MOODLAGIRI, Pai 12 Park Drive Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US | 04 /
BREITENFELD, Denny 288 Greenwood Ave Florham Park, New Jersey 07932 / US | [2020/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/15] | Application number, filing date | 18731297.0 | 24.05.2018 | [2020/15] | WO2018US34425 | Priority number, date | US201715610586 | 31.05.2017 Original published format: US201715610586 | [2020/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018222495 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3631766 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/04, G06T17/00, G06T7/593 | [2020/15] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP,KR,US);
G06T15/20 (KR,US);
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
G06T17/20 (KR,US);
G06T7/50 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR WIEDERGABE VON INHALTEN DER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT AUF DER BASIS ZWEIDIMENSIONALER (»2D ) ERFASSTER BILDER EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN ( 3D )-SZENE | [2020/15] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR RENDERING VIRTUAL REALITY CONTENT BASED ON TWO-DIMENSIONAL ("2D") CAPTURED IMAGERY OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL ("3D") SCENE | [2020/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE RENDU DE CONTENU DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE EN FONCTION D'UNE IMAGERIE CAPTURÉE BIDIMENSIONNELLE (« 2D ») D'UNE SCÈNE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE (« 3D ») | [2020/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/15] | 21.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2016045266 (CANON KK) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XI] - ALJ Y ET AL, "Space carving MVD sequences for modeling natural 3D scenes", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING; 20-1-2004 - 20-1-2004; SAN JOSE; THREE-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE PROCESSING (3DIP) AND APPLICATIONS II, BURLINGAME, CA, USA, vol. 8920, doi:10.1117/12.908608, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, (20120101), pages 829005 - 1, (20120209), XP008156343 [X] 1,9,15 * figures 1,6 * [I] 2-8,10-14,16-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.908608 | [A] - PULLI K ET AL, "SURFACE RECONSTRUCTION AND DISPLAY FROM RANGE AND COLOR DATA", GRAPHICAL MODELS, ELSEVIER, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (20000501), vol. 62, no. 3, doi:10.1006/GMOD.1999.0519, ISSN 1524-0703, pages 165 - 201, XP000976105 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/gmod.1999.0519 |