EP3622187 - SELF-TAPPING SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Partnership Twello B.V. Van der Hoevenplein 62 3072 MK Rotterdam / NL | [2024/45] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states Partnership Twello B.V. Van der Hoevenplein 62 3072 MK Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELDHOEN, George Gustaaf Van der Hoevenplein 62 3072 MK Rotterdam / NL | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/12] | 01 /
ELDHOEN, George Gustaaf Van der Hoevenplein 62 3072 MK Rotterdam / NL | Representative(s) | Geurts, Franciscus Antonius Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [2024/45] |
Former [2020/12] | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Ferguson BV P.O. Box 970 3800 AZ Amersfoort / NL | Application number, filing date | 18731537.9 | 07.05.2018 | [2020/12] | WO2018NL50297 | Priority number, date | NL20172018866 | 08.05.2017 Original published format: NL 2018866 | [2020/12] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018208149 | Date: | 15.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3622187 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3622187 | Date: | 06.11.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16B33/00 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
F16B33/006 (EP,US);
B29C45/2618 (US);
F16B25/0057 (US);
F16B25/0073 (US);
B29K2077/00 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
F16B25/0026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHNEIDENDE SCHRAUBE | [2020/12] | English: | SELF-TAPPING SCREW | [2020/12] | French: | VIS AUTO-TARAUDEUSE | [2020/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/12] | 15.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2165149 (OLSON CARL G); | [A]EP1881209 (HSU KUO-TAI [TW]); | [XA]WO2009142500 (PARTNERSHIP TWELLO B V [NL], et al); | [A]TWM446240U (ZHAO YING-QING [TW]); | [A]US2013058735 (YU PEN-CHANG [TW]); | [XA]DE102013109987 (LUDWIG HETTICH & CO KG [DE]) |