EP3590219 - BANDWIDTH PART CONFIGURATION AND OPERATION FOR NEW RADIO (NR) WIDEBAND USER EQUIPMENT (UE) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2020/52] |
Former [2020/02] | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEON, Jeongho 6813 Bluffwood Court San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
CHO, Joonyoung 13321 NW Lombardy Drive Portland, OR 97229 / US | 03 /
KWON, Hwan-Joon 1883 Agnew Road 465 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/02] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/31] |
Former [2020/02] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18731927.2 | 04.05.2018 | [2020/02] | WO2018US31251 | Priority number, date | US201762502512P | 05.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762502512 P | US201762521108P | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762521108 P | [2020/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018204884 | Date: | 08.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3590219 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3590219 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,CN);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04L27/2605 (US);
H04L49/25 (US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDBREITENTEILKONFIGURATION UND BETRIEB FÜR NEW RADIO (NR)-BREITBANDBENUTZERGERÄTE | [2020/02] | English: | BANDWIDTH PART CONFIGURATION AND OPERATION FOR NEW RADIO (NR) WIDEBAND USER EQUIPMENT (UE) | [2020/02] | French: | CONFIGURATION ET FONCTIONNEMENT DE PARTIE DE LARGEUR DE BANDE POUR UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) À LARGE BANDE DE NOUVELLE RADIO (NR) | [2020/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/02] | 04.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22165785.1 / EP4040712 | EP23195146.8 / EP4300868 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | ES | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | IT | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
MC | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
ES | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Resource allocation and indication for data channel", vol. RAN WG1, no. Spokane, USA; 20170403 - 20170407, (20170402), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1705069, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170402), XP051243200 [I] 1-8 * Sections 1-2;; figures 1-5 * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "RAN2 impacts from bandwidth part in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Hangzhou, China; 20170515 - 20170519, (20170504), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1704503 RAN2 IMPACTS FROM BANDWIDTH PART IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_98/Docs/, (20170504), XP051263606 [A] 1-8 * Section 2;; figures 1-2 * |