EP3635189 - SIDELAP INTERCONNECT FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC ROOFING MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tesla, Inc. 1 Tesla Road Austin, TX 78725 / US | [2022/25] |
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Tesla, Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEERY, Martin c/o TESLA Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 02 /
MOLINA, David c/o TESLA Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 03 /
GUTHRIE, Trevor B. c/o TESLA Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 04 /
ANDERSON, Thomas c/o TESLA Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | 05 /
HEWLETT, Jonathan c/o TESLA Inc. 3500 Deer Creek Road Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Bryn-Jacobsen, Caelia Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18733486.7 | 04.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US35924 | Priority number, date | US201762515434P | 05.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762515434 P | US201715686064 | 24.08.2017 Original published format: US201715686064 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226610 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3635189 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3635189 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/36, H02S20/25, F24S25/613 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
H02S20/25 (EP,US);
H02S20/23 (EP,KR,US);
E04B1/62 (KR,US);
E04D1/12 (EP,KR,US);
E04D1/2984 (EP,US);
E04D1/30 (EP,KR,US);
E04D1/365 (EP,KR,US);
F24S25/613 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02021 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/048 (KR,US);
H01L31/0508 (EP,KR,US);
H02S30/10 (KR,US);
H02S40/32 (EP,KR,US);
H02S40/34 (EP,KR,US);
H02S40/36 (EP,KR,US);
F24S2020/13 (EP,KR,US);
F24S2025/6002 (EP,KR,US);
Y02A30/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERDECKUNGSVERBINDUNG FÜR PHOTOVOLTAISCHE DACHMODULE | [2020/16] | English: | SIDELAP INTERCONNECT FOR PHOTOVOLTAIC ROOFING MODULES | [2020/16] | French: | INTERCONNEXION DE RECOUVREMENT LATÉRAL DESTINÉE À DES MODULES PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES DE TOITURE | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0828036 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,15 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP1362967 (SWISS SUSTAINABLE SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,6,7,11,15,17,18,20 * figure 1 *; | [X]GB2497276 (SOLECO BVBA [BE]) [X] 1-8,11,12,15,17,18,20* figures 1, 14 *; | [X]EP2784241 (FIBRECEM HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,11,12,15,17,18,20 * figure 6 *; | [X]EP2950018 (SKYLIGHT ENERGY INTERNAT INC [TW]) [X] 1-8,11,12,15,17,18,20 * figure 4 * |