EP3656185 - CELLULAR TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications public limited company 1 Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [2022/07] |
Former [2020/22] | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIAZ SENDRA, Salvador Ground Floor Faraday Building 1 Kightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department 9th Floor One Braham Braham Street London E1 8EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/22] | British Telecommunications public limited company Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor, Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 18733557.5 | 18.06.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018EP66116 | Priority number, date | EP20170181876 | 18.07.2017 Original published format: EP 17181876 | [2020/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019015900 | Date: | 24.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3656185 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W92/20, H04W76/12, H04W36/08, // H04W84/14, H04W92/04 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H04W92/20 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W84/045 (US);
H04W84/14 (EP);
H04W88/08 (US);
H04W88/16 (US);
H04W92/045 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP);
H04W76/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/31] | H04W92/20, H04W76/12, // H04W84/14, H04W92/04 | ||
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04W92/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Title | German: | ZELLULARES TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2020/22] | English: | CELLULAR TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2020/22] | French: | RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS CELLULAIRE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 11.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014126562 (GUNNARSSON FREDRIK [SE], et al); |