EP3645415 - SUPPORT, PACKAGE AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAID SUPPORT AND SAID PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/19] | SUPPORT, PACKAGE, APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAID SUPPORT AND SAID PACKAGE | ||
[2020/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, LLC 2415 Cascade Pointe Blvd. Charlotte, NC 28208 / US | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DI FIORE, Simona Via Ariosto 15 I-20017 Terrazzano di Rho (MI) / IT | 02 /
BENEDETTI, Giulio Via Matteotti 70 I-21048 Solbiate Arno (Varese) / IT | 03 /
RIZZI, Jvanohe Via N. Sauro 133D I-20025 Legnano (MI) / IT | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2021/14] |
Former [2020/19] | Sutto, Luca PGA S.P.A., Milano Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 18733688.8 | 01.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018IB53949 | Priority number, date | IT20170073576 | 30.06.2017 Original published format: IT201700073576 | [2020/19] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002989 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3645415 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3645415 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/30, B65B11/52, B65D81/20 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
B65D75/305 (EP,US);
B29D22/003 (US);
B65B11/52 (EP,US);
B65B31/02 (US);
B65D81/2015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGER, VERPACKUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES TRÄGERS UND DER VERPACKUNG | [2020/47] | English: | SUPPORT, PACKAGE AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAID SUPPORT AND SAID PACKAGE | [2020/47] | French: | SUPPORT, EMBALLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT SUPPORT ET DUDIT EMBALLAGE | [2020/47] |
Former [2020/19] | TRÄGER, VERPACKUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES BESAGTEN TRÄGERS UND DER BESAGTEN VERPACKUNG | ||
Former [2020/19] | SUPPORT, PACKAGE, APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR MAKING SAID SUPPORT AND SAID PACKAGE | ||
Former [2020/19] | SUPPORT, EMBALLAGE, APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT SUPPORT ET DUDIT EMBALLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 09.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2018 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | IE | 01.06.2021 | LU | 01.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 01.06.2018 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 01.06.2018 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
IE | 01.06.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
LU | 01.06.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2984056 (SCHOLL WILLIAM M) [A] 1-21* column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2740107 (EUROGIPACK [FR]) [A] 1-21 * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2014151917 (FUJI SEAL INT INC) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050]; figures 5-9 *; | [X]WO2016193006 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al) [X] 21 * page 20, line 3 - page 26, line 30; figures 1-13,23-29 * |