EP3644720 - NON-HUMAN MODEL FOR NEUROFIBROMATOSIS TYPE 1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paris Sciences et Lettres 60, rue Mazarine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | [2024/06] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states Paris Sciences et Lettres 60 Rue Mazarine 75006 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | |||
Former [2020/19] | For all designated states Paris Sciences et Lettres - Quartier Latin 60 Rue Mazarine 75006 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75654 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOPILKO, Piotr 15 rue de la Midorge 91470 Boullay-les-Troux / FR | 02 /
CHARNAY, Patrick 3 rue Margotin 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | 03 /
COULPIER, Fanny 9 allée des Frères Lumière 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | 04 /
GRESSET, Aurélie 99 bis rue Adolphe Pajeaud 92160 Antony / FR | 05 /
RADOMSKA, Katarzyna 71 rue du Faubourg Saint Antoine 75011 Paris / FR | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 18733885.0 | 29.06.2018 | [2020/19] | WO2018EP67675 | Priority number, date | EP20170305822 | 29.06.2017 Original published format: EP 17305822 | [2020/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019002590 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3644720 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3644720 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C07K14/47 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C12N5/0693 (US);
G01N33/5044 (US);
A01K2217/054 (US);
A01K2217/206 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0331 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTMENSCHLICHES MODELL FÜR NEUROFIBROMATOSE TYP 1 | [2024/06] | English: | NON-HUMAN MODEL FOR NEUROFIBROMATOSIS TYPE 1 | [2020/19] | French: | MODÈLE NON-HUMAIN DE LA NEUROFIBROMATOSIS DE TYPE 1 | [2024/06] |
Former [2020/19] | NICHTMENSCHLICHES MODELL FÜR NEUROFIBROMATOSE TYP 1 | ||
Former [2020/19] | MODÈLE NON HUMAIN POUR NEUROFIBROMATOSE TYPE 1 | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 29.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 07.02.2024 | |
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 07.05.2024 | |
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011035815 (ZONG HUI [US], et al); | [A]WO2016077429 (RECOMBINETICS INC [US]); | by applicant | US6172188 |