EP3641602 - A BEVERAGE-DISPENSING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luigi Lavazza S.p.A. Via Bologna 32 10152 Torino / IT | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDL, Florian Via Claudio Luigi Berthollet 42 I-10125 Torino / IT | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 18734640.8 | 12.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018IB54238 | Priority number, date | IT20170068264 | 20.06.2017 Original published format: IT201700068264 | [2020/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018234927 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3641602 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3641602 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/44 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
A47J31/44 (EP);
A47J31/4403 (US);
A47J31/3676 (US);
A47J31/52 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNKEAUTOMAT | [2020/18] | English: | A BEVERAGE-DISPENSING MACHINE | [2020/18] | French: | MACHINE DE DISTRIBUTION DE BOISSONS | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 22.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | AT | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | DK | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | ES | 14.09.2022 | FI | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | NL | 14.09.2022 | PL | 14.09.2022 | RO | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SE | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | NO | 14.12.2022 | GR | 15.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | PT | 16.01.2023 | IE | 12.06.2023 | LU | 12.06.2023 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
DK | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
NL | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
AT | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
PL | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
ES | 14.09.2022 | ||
FI | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RO | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
PT | 16.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
GR | 15.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SE | 14.09.2022 | ||
NO | 14.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X] - Anonymous, "Anyone planning on going to CoffeeFest in Portland 10/23-10/25? - Page 2 - Home-Barista.com", (20151024), URL: https://www.home-barista.com/cafes/anyone-planning-on-going-to-coffeefest-in-portland-10-23-10-25-t37403-10.html, (20171208), XP055433376 [X] 1-8 * pages 3-6 * | [X] - Howard Bryman, "Monumentally Modest, the Decent Espresso Machine Brings Wave of Innovation", (20161125), URL: https://dailycoffeenews.com/2016/11/25/monumentally-modest-the-decent-espresso-machine-brings-wave-of-innovation/, (20171208), XP055433531 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * |