EP3634895 - DRUMS FOR TRANSPORTING AND FEEDING WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Donald Q. c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
DRAGOO, Robert K. c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HGF Limited 3rd Floor Central Square South Orchard Street Newcastle Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 3AZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18734676.2 | 30.05.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US35096 | Priority number, date | US201715616680 | 07.06.2017 Original published format: US201715616680 | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226480 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3634895 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3634895 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65H49/08, B23K9/133, B65D85/04 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
B65H49/08 (EP,US);
B65D85/04 (US);
B23K9/133 (EP,US);
B65D85/672 (US);
B65H2701/36 (EP,US);
B65H75/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROMMELN ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN UND ZUFÜHREN VON DRAHT | [2020/16] | English: | DRUMS FOR TRANSPORTING AND FEEDING WIRE | [2020/16] | French: | TAMBOURS DE TRANSPORT ET DE DÉLIVRANCE DE FIL | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB404114 (WILLIAM HOLLINS & COMPANY LTD, et al) [A] 6,7,10,12,16-19 * figure - *; | [A]US2713938 (SNYDER ROBERT A) [A] 6,8,12,16,18 * figure - *; | [A]EP0693440 (BOCCHIOTTI SOC IND ELETTROTEC [IT]) [A] 6,7,11,12,16,17,19 * column 2, lines 9-15; figure - *; | [A]WO02094493 (ESAB AB [SE], et al) [A] 13,15,20* pages 4-6; figure - *; | [XAI]US6715608 (MOORE WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 4, lines 51-58 * * column 5, lines 53-57; figure - * [A] 6-20 [I] 3,5; | [XAI]US2006196989 (BARTLEY HAROLD [US], et al) [X] 16,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0035] , [0047]; figure 2 * [A] 20 [I] 18,19; | [XAI]FR2969940 (AIR LIQUIDE WELDING FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 2, lines 4-5 * * page 3, lines 13-16 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 30; figure - * [A] 6-20 [I] 3,5 |