EP3634632 - BIOLOGICAL FLUID SEPARATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [2020/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVOSEVIC, Milan 40 Cutlass Road Kinnelon New Jersey 07405 / US | 02 /
LI, Peng 425 Smith Pl Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US | 03 /
WENTZELL, Scott 35 Maplewood Blvd Suffern, NY 10901 / US | [2023/30] |
Former [2020/16] | 01 /
IVOSEVIC, Milan 40 Cutlass Road Kinnelon New Jersey 07405 / US | ||
02 /
LI, Peng 425 Smith Pl Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US | |||
03 /
WENTZELL, Scott 512 Bloomfield Ave Apt 5N Caldwell New Jersey 07006 / US | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/16] | Application number, filing date | 18734726.5 | 07.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018US36511 | Priority number, date | US201762516833P | 08.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516833 P | [2020/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018226994 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3634632 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3634632 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, A61B5/15, A61B5/154, G01N33/49, B01L3/02 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP);
A61B5/150351 (EP);
A61B5/150732 (EP);
A61B5/15074 (EP);
A61B5/150755 (EP);
A61B5/154 (EP);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP);
B01L2200/0668 (US);
B01L2300/042 (US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0636 (EP);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0832 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0877 (US);
B01L2300/0883 (US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
B01L3/0296 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRENNEN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2020/16] | English: | BIOLOGICAL FLUID SEPARATION DEVICE | [2020/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DE FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE | [2020/16] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 25.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23185334.2 / EP4241888 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2006029923 (TOGAWA KATSUYA [JP], et al); | [XAI]JP2007000536 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [XA]US2008017577 (YI JIZU [US], et al); | [XA]JP2008245778 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [XA]CN102764133 (SHANGHAI KEHUA LAB MEDICINE PRODUCT CO LTD); |