10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
03.03.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
25.03.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] |
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.02.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.02.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
29.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.02.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2021 |
First examination report |
|
04.09.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
04.09.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.04.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
11.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|