09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
05.05.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
17.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
09.06.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
27.05.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
23.05.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.05.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.05.2022 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2022 |
Change - German title |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - English title |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - French title |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
10.01.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.01.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
21.05.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.08.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
07.08.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
04.08.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
06.03.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.03.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
12.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
12.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|