EP3642984 - PHYSICAL SHARED CHANNEL TRANSMISSION TO ACKNOWLEDGEMENT DELAY OPTIMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHATTAD, Kapil 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
XU, Hao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
WANG, Xiao Feng 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
ZOHN, Nerrie 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2020/18] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18735048.3 | 06.06.2018 | [2020/18] | WO2018US36314 | Priority number, date | IN201741021940 | 22.06.2017 Original published format: IN201741021940 | US201816000624 | 05.06.2018 Original published format: US201816000624 | [2020/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018236586 | Date: | 27.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3642984 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2020/18] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L1/1812 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP,US);
H04L1/1825 (EP,US);
H04L1/1861 (US);
H04L1/1864 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1887 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04L1/0023 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/18] | Title | German: | PHYSIKALISCHE GEMEINSAME KANALÜBERTRAGUNG ZUR BESTÄTIGUNGSVERZÖGERUNGSOPTIMIERUNG | [2020/18] | English: | PHYSICAL SHARED CHANNEL TRANSMISSION TO ACKNOWLEDGEMENT DELAY OPTIMIZATION | [2020/18] | French: | TRANSMISSION SUR UN CANAL PHYSIQUE PARTAGÉ PERMETTANT UNE OPTIMISATION D'UN RETARD D'ACCUSÉ DE RÉCEPTION | [2020/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/18] | 27.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP20198537.1 / EP3780451 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004224697 (HAKKINEN HANNU [FI], et al) [Y] 7,24,41 * figure 5 * * paragraph [0032] *; | [XYI]US2015180622 (YOO TAESANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,18-21,23,35-38,40,52,54-69 * figures 2, 3A, 4-6 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0103] * [Y] 7,24,41 [I] 5,22,39; | [XI]US2016360550 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,18,19,21-23,35,36,38-40,52,54-69 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0089] * [I] 3,20,37; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on timing relations for NR frame structure", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160821), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166105, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20160821), XP051125216 [X] 8-17,25-34,42-51,53 * figures 1-4 * * page 1 - page 3 * | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Processing time reduction and related procedures for short TTI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161105), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611167, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs/, (20161105), XP051189740 [X] 8-10,14,15,18-49,53 * section 3 * |