EP3749489 - PORTABLE TOOL FOR MOBILE USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lukas Hydraulik GmbH Weinstrasse 39 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUERBIER, Carsten Kuhnhofer Hauptstrasse 21 J 91207 Lauf an der Pegnitz / DE | 02 /
KIRCHNER, Uwe Ringstraße 35 91080 Marloffstein / DE | [2020/52] |
Former [2020/51] | 01 /
SAUERBIER, Carsten Kuhnhofer Hauptstrasse 22J 91207 Lauf / DE | ||
02 /
KIRCHNER, Uwe Ringstraße 35 91080 Marloffstein / DE | Representative(s) | Stippl Patentanwälte Freiligrathstraße 7a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/51] | Stippl, Hubert STIPPL Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18735538.3 | 26.06.2018 | [2020/51] | WO2018EP67010 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020001740 | Date: | 02.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749489 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749489 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, A62B3/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
B25F5/005 (EP,US);
A62B3/005 (EP,US);
B25F5/02 (US);
G01K1/026 (US);
G01K7/16 (US);
H02K11/0094 (US);
H02K11/25 (US);
H02K11/33 (US);
H02K7/145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ARBEITSGERÄT FÜR DEN PORTABLEN EINSATZ | [2020/51] | English: | PORTABLE TOOL FOR MOBILE USE | [2020/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAVAIL PORTATIF POUR L'UTILISATION PORTABLE | [2020/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 09.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2021 | Observations by third parties | 19.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23152159.2 / EP4245467 | EP24170421.2 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | GB | 26.06.2023 | IE | 26.06.2023 | LU | 26.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
GB | 26.06.2023 | ||
IE | 26.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IE | 26.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1485169 (HOLMATRO IND EQUIP [NL]); | [A]WO2014005839 (ROEMER FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2017190799 (LUKAS HYDRAULIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2018021603 (HORNE TAMMY [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2012019758 | WO2013127452 | other | DE102008003786 | WO2015024809 | JP2017071003 | US2018117745 |