EP3566594 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING E-LIQUID THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changzhou Patent Electronic Technology Co., Ltd Room 512 Buiding No.2 Fuchen Garden Xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213001 / CN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Weihua MIAO Xiaoli No.7 Fengxiang Road xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213164 / CN | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Zaboliene, Reda METIDA Law Firm Zaboliene and Partners Business center VERTAS Gyneju 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 18736052.4 | 05.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018CN71543 | Priority number, date | CN20171013319 | 09.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710013319 | [2019/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127121 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3566594 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A24F40/85 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
A24F40/85 (EP,US);
A24F40/48 (EP,US);
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F40/53 (EP,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
B05B7/1606 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER E-FLÜSSIGKEIT DAVON | [2019/46] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING E-LIQUID THEREOF | [2019/46] | French: | CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE LIQUIDE À VAPOTER ASSOCIÉ | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2019 | Translation filed | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 13.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN204377940U (WANG XIAOQIONG) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2015131401 (KIMREE HI TECH INC) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] *; | [A]WO2016082158 (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * claim 2 *; | [XA]US2016192710 (LIU QIUMING [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0097] * [A] 2-8,12-15 | International search | [A]US6116247 (BANYASZ JOSEPH LESLIE [US], et al)[A] 1-19; | [A]CN204169058U (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-19; | [A]CN204317498U (SHENZHEN JIAPIN JIANYI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-19; | [X]CN204377940U (WANG XIAOQIONG) [X] 1, 6-10; | [A]CN104886773 (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-19; | [A]CN105901775 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) [A] 1-19; | [PX]CN106579566 (CHANGZHOU PAITENG ELECTRONIC TECH SERVICE CO LTD) [PX] 1-19 |