EP3565940 - ROTARY STEERABLE DRILLING SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH IMBALANCED FORCE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Road Houston, Texas 77073 / US | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/11] | For all designated states Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Road Houston, Texas 77073 / US | ||
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Zhiguo 1800 Cai Lun Road Shanghai 31 Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
FU, Xu 1800 Cai Lun Road Shanghai 31 Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Chengbao 300 N.E. 9th Street Oklahoma City, OK 73104 / US | 04 /
BRAZIL, Stewart, Blake General Electric Company Global Research Niskayuna, NY 12309 / US | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex/ Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2019/46] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18736156.3 | 05.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018US12471 | Priority number, date | CN20171007096 | 05.01.2017 Original published format: CN201710007096 | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018129241 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565940 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3565940 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/06, E21B23/12 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
E21B7/06 (EP,RU,US);
E21B7/04 (CN);
E21B17/10 (US);
E21B17/1014 (EP,RU);
E21B17/1078 (CN,RU);
E21B44/00 (CN,RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | DREHLENKBARES BOHRSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT VERBESSERTER KRAFTSTEUERUNG | [2019/46] | English: | ROTARY STEERABLE DRILLING SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH IMBALANCED FORCE CONTROL | [2019/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FORAGE ROTATIF ORIENTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ À CONTRÔLE DE FORCE DE DÉSÉQUILIBRE | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | IT | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | IE | 05.01.2023 | LU | 05.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | CH | 31.01.2023 | FR | 31.01.2023 | LI | 31.01.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
IT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 05.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
IE | 05.01.2023 | ||
LU | 05.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2023 | ||
CH | 31.01.2023 | ||
LI | 31.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2013341095 (PERRIN CEDRIC [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,11-13 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0052]; figures 2-4 * [A] 7-10,15 [Y] 6,14; | [Y]US2015083493 (WASSELL MARK ELLSWORTH [US]) [Y] 6,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]US2015159437 (CROWLEY DANIEL BRENDAN [GB], et al) [A] 8-10* figure 6 * | International search | [A]US4635736 (SHIRLEY KIRK R [US]) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US4811792 (LEMBCKE JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See claim 1 and figures 1-3B. *; | [Y]EP0841462 (CAMCO DRILLING GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-7 * See abstract, column 6, lines 12-29, and figure 2. *; | [A]US8210283 (BENSON TODD W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claim 1 and figures 6-7B. *; | [XYA]US2015218934 (TURNER WILLIAM EVANS [US]) [X] 11-15 * See paragraphs [0007], [0060]-[0069], [0087], [0106], [0133]-[0137], [0178]; and figures 1, 2, 6, 12-15, 17-25B. * [Y] 1-7 [A] 8-10 | by applicant | US2013341095 |