EP3565557 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR CANCER THERAPIES THAT INCLUDE DELIVERY OF HALOGENATED THYMIDINES AND THYMIDINE PHOSPHORYLASE INHIBITORS IN COMBINATION WITH RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shuttle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1 Research Court, Suite 450 Rockville, MD 20850-6252 / US | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRINDROD, Scott c/o Shuttle Pharmaceuticals LLC 1 Research Court Suite 450 Rockville MD 20850-6252 / US | 02 /
TIMOFEEVA, Olga c/o Shuttle Pharmaceuticals LLC 1 Research Court Suite 450 Rockville MD 20850-6252 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Milton c/o Shuttle Pharmaceuticals LLC 1 Research Court Suite 450 Rockville MD 20850-6252 / US | 04 /
JUNG, Mira c/o Shuttle Pharmaceuticals LLC 1 Research Court Suite 450 Rockville MD 20850-6252 / US | 05 /
DRITSCHILO, Anatoly c/o Shuttle Pharmaceuticals, LLC 1 Research Court Suite 450 Rockville MD 20850-6252 / US | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Parchmann, Stefanie Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18736185.2 | 09.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018US12914 | Priority number, date | US201762444155P | 09.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762444155 P | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018129514 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565557 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K31/513, A61K31/7072, A61P35/00 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K2121/00 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2019/46] | A61K31/505, A61K31/513, A61K31/7072 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR KREBSTHERAPIEN MIT ABGABE VON HALOGENIERTEN THYMIDINE UND THYMIDIN-PHOSPHORYLASE-INHIBITOREN IN KOMBINATION MIT STRAHLUNG | [2019/46] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR CANCER THERAPIES THAT INCLUDE DELIVERY OF HALOGENATED THYMIDINES AND THYMIDINE PHOSPHORYLASE INHIBITORS IN COMBINATION WITH RADIATION | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR THÉRAPIES ANTICANCÉREUSES COMPRENANT L'ADMINISTRATION DE THYMIDINES HALOGÉNÉES ET D'INHIBITEURS DE LA THYMIDINE PHOSPHORYLASE EN COMBINAISON AVEC UN RAYONNEMENT | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 25.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009138507 (UNIV LEUVEN KATH [BE], et al); | International search | [Y]US2008161292 (GIRANDA VINCENT L [US], et al); | [Y]US2012010165 (FUKUSHIMA MASAKAZU [JP]); | [Y]WO2016044690 (SHUTTLE PHARMACEUTICALS LLC [US], et al) |