Designated contracting states | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Validation states | MA | | MD | | TN | | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | | 04.07.2019 | Search fee paid | | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | European patent granted | 10.04.2024 | Opposition procedure | 24.01.2025 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | published on | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 13.11.2019 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 13.11.2019 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | BA ME | | Event date: | 13.11.2019 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20190704 | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MCKENZIE, JONATHAN BLAKE | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MARKEY, MICHAEL | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SHETH, PRATIK | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EBERLIN, ALEX | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EDWARDS, RICHARD | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | CRUSKIE, MICHAEL PAUL | | Event date: | 20.11.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BOLGER, JOSHUA KYLE | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | BOLGER, JOSHUA KYLE | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MARKEY, MICHAEL | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | SHETH, PRATIK | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EDWARDS, RICHARD | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | CRUSKIE, MICHAEL PAUL | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | EBERLIN, ALEX | | Event date: | 01.01.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MCKENZIE, JONATHAN BLAKE | | Event date: | 08.04.2020 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 08.04.2020 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C07C 217/84 20060101AFI20200727BHEP | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/137 20060101ALI20200727BHEP | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20200731 | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61P 35/00 20060101ALI20200727BHEP | | Event date: | 02.09.2020 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/436 20060101ALI20200727BHEP | | Event date: | 25.09.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 40017692 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 10.03.2021 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | RADIUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. | | Event date: | 11.10.2019 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 11.10.2019 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 13.07.2018 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Event date: | 27.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0031137000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C07C0217840000 | | Event date: | 30.06.2023 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Event date: | 05.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230526 | | Event date: | 02.08.2023 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20230629 | | Event date: | 08.11.2023 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 08.11.2023 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Event date: | 06.12.2023 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20231109 | | Event date: | 05.03.2024 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 08.03.2024 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 08.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Event date: | 27.07.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602018067840 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0031137000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C07C0217840000 | | Event date: | 10.04.2024 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 10.04.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.04.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 02.05.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602018067840 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Event date: | 08.05.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 01.07.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20240627 | | Event date: | 28.06.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A 3565542 PT 20240628 T | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20240621 | | Event date: | 30.07.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL FP | Code Expl.: | TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY) | | Event date: | 03.09.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20240401571 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20240819 | | Event date: | 11.09.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 44513 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 15.09.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT UEP 1674800 AT T | Code Expl.: | +PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION | Effective DATE: | 20240410 | | Event date: | 05.01.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20240923T HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 15.10.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E024467 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20240709 | | Event date: | 14.10.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2981967 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20241014 | | Event date: | 11.10.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20240923 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 28.10.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E067541 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 16.12.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20241128 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 09.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Payment DATE: | 20241125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 14.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20241230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20241230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20241211 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 16.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20241220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 17.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 17.01.2025 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 20.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 20.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20241127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 21.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20241119 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 21.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Payment DATE: | 20241121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Payment DATE: | 20241210 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 23.01.2025 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20241126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Payment DATE: | 20241125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 24.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20241217 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 17.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20240923 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20241125 | Year of Fee Payment: | 8 | | Event date: | 27.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20241126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 27.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20241205 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 28.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Payment DATE: | 20241218 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 28.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Payment DATE: | 20241216 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 10.01.2025 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 602018067840 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | | Event date: | 29.01.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20241126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 19.02.2025 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. | Effective DATE: | 20250110 | | Event date: | 25.02.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20241127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 28.02.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20241209 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 24.06.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI FGE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND | | Event date: | 11.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20241120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 11.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20250102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 15.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20250114 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 15.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20250113 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 17.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20250206 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 23.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20250109 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 24.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20250201 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 24.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20241227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 25.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20250122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 28.04.2025 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20241210 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | |