EP3565803 - AMPHIPHOBIC POROUS MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of South Florida 3802 Spectrum Blvd., Suite 100 Tampa, FL 33612 / US | For all designated states Zhejiang University 866 Yuhangtang Road Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310058 / CN | [2019/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Shengqian 17859 Arbor Greene Drive Tampa, FL 33647 / US | 02 /
XIAO, Feng-Shou 866 Yuhangtang Road Hangzhou Zhejiang 310058 / CN | 03 /
QI, Sun 15501 Bruce B Downs Boulevard Apt. 3711 Tampa, Florida 33647 / US | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 18736684.4 | 05.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018US12700 | Priority number, date | US201762443099P | 06.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762443099 P | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018129406 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3565803 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07F3/06, C07C63/28, C07C63/307, C07C65/03 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
C07F3/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/226 (EP,US);
B01J20/28057 (EP);
B01J20/28069 (EP);
B01J20/3206 (EP);
B01J20/3248 (EP);
C08J9/36 (US);
B01J20/0244 (US);
C01B39/52 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | C07C63/28, C07C63/307, C07C65/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | AMPHIPHOBE PORÖSE MATERIALIEN | [2019/46] | English: | AMPHIPHOBIC POROUS MATERIALS | [2019/46] | French: | MATÉRIAUX POREUX AMPHIPHOBES | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2019 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 20.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2014028574 (ARKEMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15* page 14 *; | [XI] - QI SUN ET AL, "Imparting amphiphobicity on single-crystalline porous materials", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20161031), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/ncomms13300, pages 1 - 7, XP055512403 [X] 1-6 * page 3; figure 2 * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms13300 | International search | [Y]US2015291870 (VAN HORN BRETT L [US], et al) [Y] 7-8, 10/7-8 * ; paragraphs [0001], [003G]-[003G], [0030], [0062], [0067] *; | [XY] - SUN, Q. et al., "Imparting amphiphobicity on single-crystalline porous materials", Nature Communications, (20160107), vol. 7, page 13300, XP055512403 [X] 1-6, 9, 10/1-6, 10/9, 18-19 * ; abstract; page 2, column 1, paragraphs 2-3; page 2, column 2, paragraph 2; page 3, Figure 2; page 3, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1; page 6, column 1, paragraph 2 * [Y] 7-8, 10/7-8, 20/18-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms13300 | [Y] - PARK, KS et al., "Exceptional chemical and thermal stability of zeolitic imidazolate frameworks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20060000), vol. 103, no. 27, pages 10186 - 10191, XP002667019 [Y] 20/18-19 * ; abstract; page 10186, column 1, paragraph 1; page 10187, Figure 1; page 10188, column 1, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0602439103 | by applicant | WO2014028574 | - XUE et al., Adv. Mater., (20110000), vol. 23, pages 4270 - 4273 | - LONOV et al., Adv. Funct. Mater., (20060000), vol. 16, pages 1153 - 1160 | - XU et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20150000), vol. 54, pages 4527 - 4530 | - QL SUN et al., "Imparting amphiphobicity on single-crystalline porous materials", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 7, pages 1 - 7 |