EP3566484 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING BEAM DIRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.04.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states FG Innovation Company Limited Flat 2623, 26/F Tuen Mun Central Square 22 Hoi Wing Road Tuen Mun, New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Chie-Ming 5F-1, No.5, Hsin-An Road Hsinchu Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu / TW | 02 /
CHENG, Yu-Hsin 5F-1, No.5, Hsin-An Road Hsinchu Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu / TW | [2019/46] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/46] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18736706.5 | 05.01.2018 | [2019/46] | WO2018CN71532 | Priority number, date | US201762442807P | 05.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762442807 P | [2019/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127120 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3566484 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00, H04W16/28, H04W88/02 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
H04W56/001 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/46] | H04W16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER STRAHLRICHTUNG | [2019/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING BEAM DIRECTION | [2019/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR DÉTERMINER UNE DIRECTION DE FAISCEAU | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2011063290 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 5, 6A, 7 *[A] 1-6,8,12; | [YA]WO2015191200 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] * * figure 6 * [A] 1-3,5-8,12; | [XAYI] - NOKIA ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL, "On NR synchronization signal periodicity", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, U.S.A.; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1612804, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051176746 [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * Section 2.2 * * Section 2.5 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 8 [Y] 4,7 [I] 3 | [A] - ZTE ZTE MICROELECTRONICS, "Considerations on SS burst design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20161114 - 20161118, (20161113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1611269, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20161113), XP051175250 [A] 1-8,12 * Section 3 * | International search | [A]CN104184504 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104205674 (INTEL CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]CN105282774 (FUJIAN RUIJIE NETWORKS CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]CN105491682 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0055]-[0160] and figures 2-16 *; | [A]CN106102104 (ZTE WAVETONE SCINECE&TECHNOLOGY LTD) [A] 1-20* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2015191200 |