EP3549264 - SHIFT COEFFICIENT AND LIFTING FACTOR DESIGN FOR NR LDPC CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1 Dusing Rd. 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Mao-Ching 6F.-2, No.167 Chencuoliao Sanhsing Tsun Minxiong Township Chiayi County 621 / TW | 02 /
FISHER-JEFFES, Timothy Perrin 5 Chalk Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
LEE, Chong-You 4F., No.16, Ln. 218 Zunxian St. Beitou Dist. Taipei City 112 / TW | 04 /
HSU, Cheng-Yi 8F., No.36, Ln. 173, Sec. 1 Zhongcheng Rd. Shilin Dist. Taipei City 111 / TW | 05 /
CHANG, Yen-Shuo 6F., No.185 Guanxin E. Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 06 /
CHEN, Wei-Jen 1F, No.10, Ln. 16 Wenzhou St. Da'an Dist. Taipei City 106 / TW | 07 /
CHEN, Ju-Ya No.34 Ln. 129 Nenjiang St. Sanmin Dist. Kaohsiung City 807 / TW | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 18736710.7 | 09.01.2018 | [2019/41] | WO2018CN71868 | Priority number, date | US201762443852P | 09.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762443852 P | US201762449677P | 24.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762449677 P | US201715594239 | 12.05.2017 Original published format: US201715594239 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018127196 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3549264 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11, H03M13/03 | [2020/04] | CPC: |
H03M13/036 (EP);
H03M13/116 (EP);
H03M13/1185 (EP);
H03M13/618 (EP);
H03M13/6516 (EP);
H03M13/6306 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/41] | H03M13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERSCHIEBUNGSFAKTOR- UND HEBEFAKTORDESIGN FÜR NR-LDPC-CODE | [2019/41] | English: | SHIFT COEFFICIENT AND LIFTING FACTOR DESIGN FOR NR LDPC CODE | [2019/41] | French: | CONCEPTION DE FACTEURS D'ÉLÉVATION ET DE COEFFICIENTS DE DÉCALAGE DESTINÉE À UN CODE LDPC NR | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 28.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IP] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; Multiplexing and channel coding (Release 15)", 3GPP STANDARD ; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION ; 3GPP TS 38.212, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20170812), vol. RAN WG1, no. V0.0.1, pages 1 - 23, XP051336737 [IP] 1-15 * page 9 - page 15 * | [I] - ERICSSON, "LDPC Code Design for NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Lisbon, Portugal; 20161010 - 20161014, (20161001), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1608875_LDPC CODE DESIGN FOR NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86b/Docs/, (20161001), XP051159202 [I] 1,13 * page 1 - page 3 * * Appendix A * | [I] - "IEEE Standard for Local and metropolitan area networks Part 16: Air Interface for Broadband Wireless Access Systems;IEEE Std 802.16-2009 (Revision of IEEE Std 802.16-2004)", IEEE STANDARD, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090529), ISBN 978-0-7381-5919-5, pages 1 - 2080, XP068045637 [I] 1,9,13 * page 1057 - page 1061 * | International search | [A]US2010257425 (YUE GUOSEN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]CN105471547 (BROADCOM CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - MEDIATEK INC., "Implementation considerations on flexible and efficient LDPC decoders", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #86bis, R1-1609337, (20161014), XP051149380 [A] 1-20 * Sections 1, 2 * | [A] - ZTE CORP. et al., "Consideration on LDPC codes for NR", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #85, R1-165409, (20160527), XP051111602 [A] 1-20 * The whole document * |