EP3652872 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DERIVING AUDIO PARAMETER VALUES FROM AN AES67-COMPATIBLE AUDIO INFORMATION SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut für Rundfunktechnik GmbH c/o Bayerischer Rundfunk Rundfunkplatz 1 80335 München / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Institut für Rundfunktechnik GmbH Floriansmühlstrasse 60 80939 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMANN, Franz Frauenberg 19 84036 Landshut / DE | 02 /
RENJEWSKI, Felix Rathausstrasse 5a 85586 Poing / DE | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Koplin, Moritz Anne-Conway-Straße 1 28359 Bremen / DE | [2020/21] | Application number, filing date | 18736942.6 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018EP68781 | Priority number, date | IT20170078297 | 11.07.2017 Original published format: IT201700078297 | [2020/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019011981 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3652872 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3652872 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/65 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04L65/65 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/162 (US);
G10L19/167 (KR);
H04L65/70 (KR);
H04L69/22 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | H04J3/06, H04L29/06, G10L19/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ABLEITEN VON AUDIOPARAMETERWERTEN AUS EINEM AES67 KOMPATIBLEN AUDIOINFORMATIONSSIGNAL | [2020/21] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DERIVING AUDIO PARAMETER VALUES FROM AN AES67-COMPATIBLE AUDIO INFORMATION SIGNAL | [2020/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION DE VALEURS DE PARAMÈTRES AUDIO À PARTIR D'UN SIGNAL D'INFORMATIONS AUDIO COMPATIBLE AES 67 | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 23.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 23.08.2023 | |
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 23.08.2023 | |
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [IA] - SCHMIDT FLORIAN ET AL, "A heuristic header error recovery scheme for RTP", 2013 10TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS ON-DEMAND NETWORK SYSTEMS AND SERVICES (WONS), IEEE, doi:10.1109/WONS.2013.6578345, ISBN 978-1-4799-0747-2, (20130318), pages 186 - 190, (20130812), XP032476924 [I] 1-4,11-14 * chapters I and II * [A] 5-10,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WONS.2013.6578345 | [A] - REHA CIVANLAR M, "Protocols for real-time multimedia data transmission over the Internet", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 6, ISBN 978-0-7803-4428-0, pages 3809 - 3812, XP010279676 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHULZRINNE H ET AL, "RTP: A Transport Protocol for Real-Time Applications", NETWORK WORKING GROUP REQUEST FOR COMMENTS, XX, XX, (20040405), no. 3550, pages 1 - 104, XP002356069 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |