EP3634911 - POROUS MATERIALS FORMED OF IRIDIUM AND/OR IRIDUM OXIDE BASED MICROSPHERES, ITS PREPARATION PROCESS AND ITS USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/16] | POROUS MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF IRIDIUM AND/OR IRIDIUM OXIDE BASED MICROSPHERES, THE PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF AND THE USES THEREOF | ||
[2023/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris 6 / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris Cité 85 boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris 6 / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Paris 85 boulevard Saint-Germain 75006 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2020/16] | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris 6 / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states Université Paris Diderot - Paris 7 5, rue Thomas Mann 75205 Paris Cedex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUSTINI, Marco 14 rue du Val de Grace 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
BOISSIERE, Cédric 21 rue de Montreux 91140 Villebon Sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
PERON, Jennifer 14 rue du Val de Grace 75005 Paris / FR | 04 /
TARD, Cédric 100 avenue Paul Vaillant Couturier 94400 Vitry-Sur-Seine / FR | 05 /
GIRAUD, Marion 106 rue Monge 75005 Paris / FR | 06 /
JONES, Deborah 67 avenue du Pic Saint Loup Mas de Bouis 34380 Saint Martin De Londres / FR | [2020/16] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/44] |
Former [2020/16] | De Lamo Marin, Sandra, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 18737659.5 | 06.06.2018 | [2020/16] | WO2018FR51302 | Priority number, date | FR20170055006 | 06.06.2017 Original published format: FR 1755006 | [2020/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018224771 | Date: | 13.12.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3634911 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3634911 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01G55/00 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
C01G55/004 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08L23/12 (US);
C08L33/12 (US);
C08L53/00 (US);
C25B1/04 (EP);
C25B11/04 (EP);
C01P2002/70 (US);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/34 (US);
C01P2004/60 (US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (US);
C01P2006/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORÖSE MATERIALEN GEBILDET AUS MIKROSPHEREN AUF BASIS VON IRIDIUM UND/ODER IRIDIUM OXID, DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/25] | English: | POROUS MATERIALS FORMED OF IRIDIUM AND/OR IRIDUM OXIDE BASED MICROSPHERES, ITS PREPARATION PROCESS AND ITS USES | [2023/25] | French: | MATÉRIAU POREUX SOUS LA FORME DE MICROSPHÈRES À BASE D'IRIDIUM ET/OU D'OXYDE D'IRIDIUM, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/16] | PORÖSES MATERIAL IN FORM VON IRIDIUM- UND/ODER IRIDIUMOXIDBASIERTEN MIKROKUGELN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | ||
Former [2020/16] | POROUS MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF IRIDIUM AND/OR IRIDIUM OXIDE BASED MICROSPHERES, THE PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF AND THE USES THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/16] | 12.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 01.11.2023 | |
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HR | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - OSAKA A ET AL, "Iridium oxide films via sol-gel processing", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 178, doi:10.1016/0022-3093(94)90300-X, ISSN 0022-3093, (19941103), pages 313 - 319, (19941103), XP024060443 [X] 1-3 * page 315, paragraph 3.2 * [Y] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(94)90300-X | [Y] - MARSHALL A ET AL, "Iridium oxide-based nanocrystalline particles as oxygen evolution electrocatalysts", RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ELECTROCHEMISTRY, NAUKA/INTERPERIODICA, MO, (20061001), vol. 42, no. 10, doi:10.1134/S1023193506100223, ISSN 1608-3342, pages 1134 - 1140, XP019437596 [Y] 1-19 * Experimental; page 1134 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1023193506100223 | [Y] - SEONG JUNG KWON ET AL, "Observing Iridium Oxide (IrO x ) Single Nanoparticle Collisions at Ultramicroelectrodes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20100929), vol. 132, no. 38, doi:10.1021/ja106054c, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13165 - 13167, XP055443428 [Y] 1-19 * page 13165, column 1, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja106054c | by applicant | JP2014073467 | - SHARIFI et al., Chem. Soc. Rev., (20120000), vol. 41, pages 2323 - 2343 |