Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3646082

Designated contracting statesALLapse: 26.05.2021
 AT 
 BE 
 BGLapse: 26.08.2021
 CH 
CYLapse: 26.05.2021
 CZLapse: 26.05.2021
 DE 
 DKLapse: 26.05.2021
 EELapse: 26.05.2021
 ES 
 FILapse: 26.05.2021
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 27.08.2021
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 ISLapse: 26.09.2021
 IT 
 LI 
 LTLapse: 26.05.2021
 LULapse: 26.06.2021
 LVLapse: 26.05.2021
 MCLapse: 26.05.2021
 MKLapse: 26.05.2021
 MTLapse: 26.05.2021
 NLLapse: 26.05.2021
 NOLapse: 26.08.2021
 PL 
 PT 
 ROLapse: 26.05.2021
 RSLapse: 26.05.2021
 SE 
 SILapse: 26.05.2021
 SKLapse: 26.05.2021
 SMLapse: 26.05.2021
 TR 
Validation statesKH 
 MA 
 MD 
TN 
Examination procedure14.04.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase21.01.2020National basic fee paid 
21.01.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2020Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted26.05.2021
Opposition procedure01.03.2022No opposition filed within time limit published on 27.04.2022 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.05.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:06.05.2020 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:06.05.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20200121
 
Event date:07.10.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:07.10.2020 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:08.12.2020 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:SCOTTA, FELICE
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:DANNOUX, THIERRY LUC ALAIN
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20201209
 
Event date:06.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:ROSSON, JOEL CHRISTOPHER
 
Event date:16.04.2021 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:08.12.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:03.04.2020 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:04.01.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:18.07.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: UNKNOWN
 
Event date:23.04.2021 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:23.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED
 
Event date:03.04.2020 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:26.05.2021 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:26.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:31.05.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 1396791 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA)
Effective DATE:20210615
 
Event date:17.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602018017736 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:23.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:07.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A 3646082 PT 20210707 T
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:10.09.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG9D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:27.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR TUEP P20211203T HR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED
 
Event date:15.10.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20211203T HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20210928
Year of Fee Payment:4
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210826
 
Event date:28.10.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E055059 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:03.11.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MP
Code Expl.:-PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR T1PR P20211203 HR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210826
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210827
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210926
 
Event date:09.12.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2883936 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20211209
 
Event date:31.12.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:15.01.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 1396791 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SM
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:02.04.2022 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:02.04.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:04.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210626
 
Event date:04.04.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:01.03.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602018017736 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20220301
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:22.07.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20211203 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20220609
Year of Fee Payment:5
 
Event date:01.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210926
 
Event date:30.06.2023 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:12.07.2023 
Event description:OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED
Effective DATE:20230527
 
Event date:07.07.2023 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20211203 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20230517
Year of Fee Payment:6
 
Event date:30.04.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:31.05.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20240319
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:05.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20240527
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:08.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20240509
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:10.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20240509
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:05.07.2024 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HR ODRP P20211203 HR
Code Expl.:+RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT
Payment DATE:20240527
Year of Fee Payment:7
 
Event date:18.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20240527
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:23.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20240527
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:31.07.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20240509
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:01.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20240527
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20240514
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20240530
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.08.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20240514
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:30.09.2024 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20210526
 
Event date:30.09.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20240611
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:21.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20240709
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:21.10.2024 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20240701
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:08.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20250311
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:25.04.2025 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20250319
Year of Fee Payment:08