Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021230689 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | US201815959712 | 23.04.2018 | US201815960035 | 23.04.2018 | US201815959897 | 23.04.2018 | US202117181271 | 22.02.2021 | US202117227639 | 12.04.2021 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | US201815959984 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021172014 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | US202117181271 | 22.02.2021 | US201815959984 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11459610 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2022 | B2 | US2018305753 | 25.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | US201815960035 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10995369 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2021 | B2 | US2018305751 | 25.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201815959897 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10975430 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2021 | B2 | US2018305750 | 25.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | US201815959712 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10934584 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2021 | B2 | US2018305752 | 25.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | US201815959984 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3913053 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | EP18727420 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3872187 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2022 | B1 | EP3872187 | 01.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | EP18723273 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3842545 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2022 | B1 | EP3842545 | 30.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | EP18723275 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3615691 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2021 | B1 | EP3615691 | 04.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3615690 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2021 | B1 | EP3615690 | 04.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3615671 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2021 | B1 | EP3615671 | 04.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111094584 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110785497 | Global Dossier | 11.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00509 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110785492B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2024 | B | CN110785492 | 11.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110770353 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3060979 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2023 | C | CA3060979 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3059952 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | C | CA3059952 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3059840 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2022 | C | CA3059840 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00509 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3059839 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2023 | C | CA3059839 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2024202607 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | AU2024202607 | 22.04.2024 | AU2021203361 | 24.05.2021 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | AU2018260633 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022202505 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | AU2018259202 | 23.04.2018 | AU2022202505 | 14.04.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021203361B | Global Dossier | 16.05.2024 | B2 | AU2021203361 | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | AU2021203361 | 24.05.2021 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | AU2018260633 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018260633C | Global Dossier | 15.08.2024 | C1 | AU2018260633B | 15.04.2021 | B2 | AU2018260633 | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018260627B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2024 | B2 | AU2018260627 | 14.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018259206B | Global Dossier | 11.07.2024 | B2 | AU2018259206 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00509 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018259202B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2022 | B2 | AU2018259202 | 07.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3615692 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00509 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3615671T | 18.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3615690T | 15.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3615691T | 26.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3872187T | 05.12.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | EP18723273 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2882608T | 02.12.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2889585T | 12.01.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2893528T | 09.02.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201909394P | 28.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018US28881 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201909914R | 28.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00497 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201909916Y | 28.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | WO2018IB00509 | 23.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201909918X | 28.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018US28867 | 23.04.2018 | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018200386 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2019 | A8 | WO2018200386 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018200380 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | A8 | WO2018200380 | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018197950 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488824 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018197945 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762488825 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2929837T | 02.12.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2937929T | 03.04.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3842545T | 31.01.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488833 | 23.04.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI3872187T | 15.12.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762488830 | 23.04.2017 |