EP3615692 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING SAMPLE IDENTIFICATION IN INDEXED NUCLEIC ACID LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Vincent, Peter 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | 02 /
BEVIS-MOTT, Claire 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | 03 /
BOUTELL, Jonathan, Mark 19 Granta Park Great Abington Cambridge CB21 6DF / GB | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 18737965.6 | 23.04.2018 | [2020/10] | WO2018IB00509 | Priority number, date | US201762488824P | 23.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762488824 P | [2020/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018197950 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615692 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6806, C12Q1/6837, C12Q1/6855 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (US);
C12N15/1065 (US);
C12N15/1068 (US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6855 (US);
C07B2200/11 (US);
C40B20/04 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2525/191, C12Q2535/122, C12Q2565/537 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER PROBENIDENTIFIKATION IN INDIZIERTEN NUKLEINSÄUREBIBLIOTHEKEN | [2020/10] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR IMPROVING SAMPLE IDENTIFICATION IN INDEXED NUCLEIC ACID LIBRARIES | [2020/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR AMÉLIORER L'IDENTIFICATION D'ÉCHANTILLONS DANS DES BIBLIOTHÈQUES D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES INDEXÉES | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 11.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004209299 (PINTER JONATHON H [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011112534 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2016017392 (ARNOLD LYLE J [US], et al); | [Y]US2016186249 (BECKER MICHAEL M [US], et al); | [Y]US2016355880 (GORMLEY NIALL ANTHONY [GB], et al); | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | US5763594 | US5808045 | WO9844151 | US5872244 | US5990300 | WO0018957 | US6214987 | US6232465 | US6306597 | WO2004018497 | US2005100900 | WO2005065814 | US7057026 | WO2006064199 | US7115400 | WO2007010251 | WO2007010252 | WO2007123744 | WO2007135368 | WO2008041002 | US7399590 | US7427673 | US7541444 | US7566537 | US7772384 | US7771973 | US7785796 | US7829284 | US7985565 | US8053192 | US8071739 | US8148064 | US8158346 | US8394586 | US8399188 | US8460910 | US8597881 | US8623628 | US8808988 | US8852910 | US9051612 | WO2015106941 | US9121062 | US9121060 | US2015376582 | US2016002721 | US2016032377 | US9273352 | US2016060692 | US2016090579 | US2016115461 | US9388463 | US9388464 | US9410200 | US9447389 | US9469873 | US19330624888 |