EP3648747 - GASTRORETENTIVE DOSAGE FORMS FOR SUSTAINED DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amneal Complex Products Research LLC 995 U.S. Highway 202/206 Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2021/35] |
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Kashiv Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC 995 U.S. Highway 202/206 Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | ||
Former [2020/20] | For all designated states Kashiv Biosciences, LLC 995 US 202/206 Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEGHPARA, Kanji 60 Stockton Court Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
SANDHU, Harpreet Kaur 73 Manger Road West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | 03 /
CHATTERJI, Ashish 7 Prescott Road East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 04 /
SHAH, Navnit H. 203 Beverly Hill Road Clifton, NJ 07012 / US | 05 /
PHUAPRADIT, Wantanee 4 Effingham-Low Court Montville, NJ 07045 / US | 06 /
DESAI, Dipen 202 Altaview Court Whippany, NJ 07981 / US | 07 /
VAGHASHIYA, Jaydeep 1407 Van Wickle Dr. Franklin Park, NJ 08823 / US | [2020/39] |
Former [2020/20] | 01 /
MEGHPARA, Kanji 60 Stockton Court Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | ||
02 /
SANDHU, Harpreet Kaur 73 Manger Road West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | |||
03 /
CHATTERJI, Ashish 7 Prescott Road East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | |||
04 /
SHAH, Navnit H. 203 Beverly Hill Road Clifton, NJ 07012 / US | |||
05 /
PHUAPRADIT, Wantanee 4 Effingham-Low Court Montville, NJ 07045 / US | |||
06 /
DESAI, Dipen 202 Altaview Court Whippany, NJ 07981 / US | |||
07 /
VAGHASHIYA, Jaydeep 190 Roanoke Street Woodbridge, NJ 07095 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/20] | Application number, filing date | 18738169.4 | 18.06.2018 | [2020/20] | WO2018US38118 | Priority number, date | US201762520796P | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762520796 P | [2020/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018232413 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3648747 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3648747 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22, A61K31/403, A61K31/421, A61K31/55, A61K9/28, A61K9/24 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
A61K9/0065 (EP,US);
A61K31/195 (US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/403 (US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (US);
A61K31/421 (EP,US);
A61K31/4412 (US);
A61K31/4425 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61K47/34 (US);
A61K47/38 (US);
A61K9/0007 (US);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/2054 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTRORETENTIVE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN FÜR VERZÖGERTE WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG | [2020/20] | English: | GASTRORETENTIVE DOSAGE FORMS FOR SUSTAINED DRUG DELIVERY | [2020/20] | French: | FORMES POSOLOGIQUES À RÉTENTION GASTRIQUE DESTINÉES À UNE ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT PROLONGÉE | [2020/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/20] | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/20] | 26.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 26.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/33] | Request for further processing for: | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2020 | Decision despatched | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 26.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.09.2022 | AT | 07.09.2022 | CZ | 07.09.2022 | EE | 07.09.2022 | FI | 07.09.2022 | HR | 07.09.2022 | LT | 07.09.2022 | LV | 07.09.2022 | MC | 07.09.2022 | PL | 07.09.2022 | RO | 07.09.2022 | RS | 07.09.2022 | SI | 07.09.2022 | SK | 07.09.2022 | SM | 07.09.2022 | NO | 07.12.2022 | GR | 08.12.2022 | IS | 07.01.2023 | PT | 09.01.2023 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SI | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 07.09.2022 | |
AT | 07.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
PL | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
IS | 07.01.2023 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
EE | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SK | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 07.09.2022 | |
CZ | 07.09.2022 | ||
FI | 07.09.2022 | ||
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RO | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
PT | 09.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
SM | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
HR | 07.09.2022 | ||
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
LV | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 07.09.2022 | |
LT | 07.09.2022 | ||
RS | 07.09.2022 | ||
NO | 07.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004066981 (SUN PHARMACEUTICAL IND LTD [IN], et al); | [IAY]US2004180086 (RAMTOOLA ZEBUNNISSA [IE], et al); | [A]WO2008068731 (BIOVAIL LAB INT SRL [BB], et al); | [XYI]US2010112053 (MOMOSE DENICHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4101650 | US4777033 | US4844905 | WO0015198 | WO0110419 | WO0200213 | US2010305208 |