EP3668462 - DRESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lohmann & Rauscher GmbH & Co. KG Irlicher Strasse 55 56567 Neuwied / DE | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODEL, Kirsten Rembrandtstraße 3 56566 Neuwied / DE | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Daniel Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Seranski, Klaus Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18738270.0 | 03.07.2018 | [2020/26] | WO2018EP67954 | Priority number, date | DE201710118964 | 18.08.2017 Original published format: DE102017118964 | [2020/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019034322 | Date: | 21.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668462 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/02 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/023 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00821 (US);
A61F2013/00829 (US);
A61M2025/0266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/26] | Title | German: | AUFLAGE | [2020/26] | English: | DRESSING | [2020/26] | French: | PANSEMENT | [2020/26] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/26] | 14.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9421207 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 12, line 33 - page 16, line 30; figures 1-2 *; | [X]US5628724 (DEBUSK JANET S [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 51; figure - *; | [X]EP1683502 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-16* paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figure - * | by applicant | WO9825559 | DE102005003391 | DE102012223399 |