EP3402234 - UPDATING UE CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/46] | METHOD FOR UPDATING UE CONFIGURATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME | ||
[2023/50] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2018/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Jinsook IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Sangmin IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyunsook IP Center LG Electronics Inc. 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2018/46] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/15] |
Former [2018/46] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18738504.2 | 16.01.2018 | [2018/46] | WO2018KR00737 | Priority number, date | US201762446786P | 16.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762446786 P | US201762459619P | 16.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762459619 P | US201762492967P | 02.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762492967 P | US201762501110P | 04.05.2017 Original published format: US 201762501110 P | US201762543990P | 11.08.2017 Original published format: US 201762543990 P | [2018/46] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018131984 | Date: | 19.07.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3402234 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3402234 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.07.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/08, H04W60/04, // H04W48/18, H04W60/00, H04W76/27, H04W24/02 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
H04W60/04 (EP);
H04W8/08 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/46] | H04W8/08, H04W60/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTUALISIERUNG DER BENUTZERGERÄTEKONFIGURATION | [2023/50] | English: | UPDATING UE CONFIGURATION | [2023/50] | French: | MISE À JOUR DE CONFIGURATION D'UN UE | [2023/50] |
Former [2018/46] | VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG DER BENUTZERGERÄTEKONFIGURATION IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | ||
Former [2018/46] | METHOD FOR UPDATING UE CONFIGURATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR SAME | ||
Former [2018/46] | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À JOUR DE CONFIGURATION D'UE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2018 | Translation filed | 07.08.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 04.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1351424 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0079]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN101621786B (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]US2013039244 (SUN LI-HSIANG [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058] *; | [I]CN105188111 (GUANGDONG ZHICHENG CHAMPION GROUP CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0070]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0090]; figure 3 *; | [IP] - LG ELECTRONICS ET AL, "TS 23.502 P-CR new procedure on NW initiated UE configuration update", vol. SA WG2, no. Dubrovnik; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170207), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-170854_TS 23.502 P-CR NEW PROCEDURE ON NW INITIATED UE CONFIGURATION UPDATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPH, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_119_Dubrovnik/Docs/, (20170207), XP051228143 [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP2427029 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0040]; and claims 1-4. *; | [A]KR101539882B (LG UPLUS CORP.) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0043]: and claims 1, 2 *; | [XA]US2016066219 (POIKONEN HENRI MIKAEL [FI], et al) [X] 1, 2, 11, 12, 15 * See paragraphs [00361-[00401, [0047], [0048]. and claims 25-28. * [A] 3-10, 13, 14, 16, 17; | [A]US2016205625 (STOJANOVSKI ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0065]. and claims 1-6. *; | [PX] - LG ELECTRONICS et al., "TS 23.502 P-CR New Procedure on NW Initiaed UE Configuration Update", S2-171854 , 3GPP TSG SA WG2 Meeting #120, Busan, Korea, (20170321), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch'TSGS2_120_Busan/Docs, XP051257439 [PX] 1, 11 * See section 4.2.X.2. * | Examination | - LG ELECTRONICS ET AL, "TS 23.502 P-CR new procedure on NW initiated UE configuration update", vol. SA WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20170327 - 20170331, (20170321), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-171854_TS 23.502 P-CR NEW PROCEDURE ON NW INITIATED UE CONFIGURATION UPDATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPH, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_120_Busan/Docs/, (20170321), XP051257439 | - LG ELECTRONICS, "TS 23.501 Update to Mobility Restriction", vol. SA WG2, no. Busan, Korea; 20170327 - 20170331, (20170326), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-171855_TS 23.501 P-CR MOBILITY RESTRICTION UPDATE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANC, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20170326), XP051247592 |