Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
11.04.2022 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.01.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.12.2021 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.12.2021 | First examination report | |
29.01.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.09.2020 | Change - representative | |
11.06.2020 | Supplementary search report | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
05.06.2020 | Change - classification | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
20.03.2020 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
20.03.2020 | Change - extension states | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
23.01.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.08.2019 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
16.08.2019 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
17.07.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2019 | Change - representative | |
14.06.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.08.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.07.2018 | PCT data prior to European publication |