Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10746361 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2020 | B2 | US2019353314 | 21.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816468557 | 15.01.2018 | US201762564995 | 28.09.2017 | US201762446731 | 16.01.2017 | WO2018US13741 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190099434 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762564995 | 28.09.2017 | US201762446731 | 16.01.2017 | WO2018US13741 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7079257B | Global Dossier | 01.06.2022 | B2 | JP2020504429 | 06.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762564995 | 28.09.2017 | US201762446731 | 16.01.2017 | WO2018US13741 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110291615B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2022 | B | CN110291615 | 27.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762564995 | 28.09.2017 | US201762446731 | 16.01.2017 | WO2018US13741 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3539146 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | A4 | EP3539146 | 18.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762564995 | 28.09.2017 | US201762446731 | 16.01.2017 | WO2018US13741 | 15.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018132800 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762564995 | 28.09.2017 | US201762446731 | 16.01.2017 |