|
25.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.2021 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.02.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2020 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2020 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2020 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2019 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2019 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2019 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.05.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2018 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
50 |