EP3703945 - SOLAR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balder Energy S.L.U CL Sao Paulo-C.Emprendedores, 136 35008 Las Palmas / ES | [2020/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEM-JENSEN, Ken c/o Uffe Olsen Nørrebrogade 66, 1. tv. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2021/27] |
Former [2020/39] | 01 /
HEM-JENSEN, Ken c/0 Uffe Olsen Nørrebrogade 66, 1. tv. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
Former [2020/37] | 01 /
HEM-JENSEN, Ken Nørrebrogade 66, 1.tv. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | Representative(s) | Nordic Patent Service A/S Bredgade 30 1260 Copenhagen K / DK | [2020/37] | Application number, filing date | 18739461.4 | 20.06.2018 | [2020/37] | WO2018EP66388 | Priority number, date | DK2017PA70811 | 30.10.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770811 | DK2017PA70920 | 07.12.2017 Original published format: DK PA201770920 | [2020/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018158470 | Date: | 07.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3703945 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3703945 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, H01L31/048, B32B17/04, H01L31/049, H02S20/25 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
H01L31/048 (EP,IL);
H01L31/054 (US);
B32B17/04 (EP,IL);
B32B17/10018 (EP,IL);
B32B17/10788 (EP,IL);
F21S8/086 (US);
F21S9/035 (US);
H01L31/02168 (US);
H01L31/049 (EP,IL,US);
H02S20/25 (EP,IL,US);
H02S20/26 (US);
B32B2327/12 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2020/37] | B32B17/10, H01L31/0216 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARMODUL | [2020/37] | English: | SOLAR MODULE | [2020/37] | French: | MODULE SOLAIRE | [2020/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/37] | 02.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2018 | AL | 05.01.2022 | CY | 05.01.2022 | CZ | 05.01.2022 | DK | 05.01.2022 | EE | 05.01.2022 | HR | 05.01.2022 | LT | 05.01.2022 | LV | 05.01.2022 | MC | 05.01.2022 | MK | 05.01.2022 | PL | 05.01.2022 | RO | 05.01.2022 | RS | 05.01.2022 | SI | 05.01.2022 | SK | 05.01.2022 | SM | 05.01.2022 | BG | 05.04.2022 | GR | 06.04.2022 | IS | 05.05.2022 | PT | 05.05.2022 | IE | 20.06.2022 | [2024/24] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
MK | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 20.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CY | 05.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 20.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
IE | 20.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SI | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
MC | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 05.01.2022 | |
CZ | 05.01.2022 | ||
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SK | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 05.01.2022 | |
DK | 05.01.2022 | ||
EE | 05.01.2022 | ||
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RO | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
SM | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 05.01.2022 | |
HR | 05.01.2022 | ||
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IS | 05.05.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
LV | 05.01.2022 | ||
PL | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
GR | 06.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 05.01.2022 | |
LT | 05.01.2022 | ||
RS | 05.01.2022 | ||
BG | 05.04.2022 | ||
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 05.01.2022 | |
PT | 05.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 05.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5807440 (KUBOTA YUICHI [JP], et al); | [XAI]JP2001047568 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [XAI]US2008006323 (KALKANOGLU HUSNU M [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2009089236 (CERTAIN TEED CORP [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2017090056 (INDIAN INST TECHNOLOGY BOMBAY [IN]) |