EP3658491 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMMONIA SYNTHESIS GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2022/33] |
Former [2020/23] | For all designated states Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Pat A. Krokushaven 15 2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
KRØLL JENSEN, Annette E. Maglegårdsvej 327 3480 Fredensborg / DK | [2020/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Topsoe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2020/23] | Haldor Topsøe A/S Haldor Topsøes Allé 1 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Application number, filing date | 18739849.0 | 11.07.2018 | [2020/23] | WO2018EP68808 | Priority number, date | DK2017PA00425 | 25.07.2017 Original published format: DK PA201700425 | DK2017PA00522 | 25.09.2017 Original published format: DK PA201700522 | DK2018PA00237 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: DK PA201800237 | [2020/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019020378 | Date: | 31.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3658491 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3658491 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/02, C01B3/38, C01C1/04, C01B13/02, C25B1/04, C01B3/48 | [2020/23] | CPC: |
C01C1/0405 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B3/025 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B3/382 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B3/384 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B3/48 (EP,IL,KR);
C25B1/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/0233 (IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/0244 (IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/0283 (IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/0445 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/046 (IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C01B2203/0816 (EP,IL,KR);
C01B2203/1235 (IL,KR,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMMONIAKSYNTHESEGAS | [2020/23] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF AMMONIA SYNTHESIS GAS | [2020/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE GAZ DE SYNTHESE D'AMMONIAC | [2020/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/23] | 23.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.05.2024
30.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE CASALE SA Via Pocobelli 6 6900 Lugano / CH Opponent's representative M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2024/27] | 14.06.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004028595 (DAVEY WILLIAM [DE], et al); | [YA]US2004063798 (ERIKSTRUP NIELS [DK], et al); | [Y]US2009165459 (HENRIKSEN NIELS [DK], et al); | [Y]US2009314994 (FILIPPI ERMANNO [CH], et al); | [Y]CN101892492 (WUXI SUNFUEL ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [YA]US2012100062 (NAKAMURA NORIHIKO [JP], et al) | Examination | US2013345325 | Opposition | IN1659DELNP2009 | US5736116 | US2004028595 | US2009314994 | US2012100062 | FR2969998 | WO2013013895 | EP2373575 | US2016115017 | US2016319381 | WO2017103679 |