EP3638558 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO OBTAIN PASSENGER FEEDBACK IN RESPONSE TO AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE DRIVING EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UATC, LLC 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco CA 94103 / US | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIX, Molly Castle 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco California 94103 / US | 02 /
CHIN, Sean Rhee 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco California 94103 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Dennis 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco California 94103 / US | 04 /
HERTZ, Daniel 1455 Market Street 4th Floor San Francisco California 94103 / US | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Grant, David Michael Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2020/17] | Application number, filing date | 18740681.4 | 15.06.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018US37750 | Priority number, date | US201715625145 | 16.06.2017 Original published format: US201715625145 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018232237 | Date: | 20.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3638558 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/08, G06Q10/06 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0282 (EP,US);
B60W50/08 (EP,US);
B60W50/10 (EP);
B60W60/0013 (EP);
G06Q10/0639 (EP,US);
G07C5/085 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHALTUNG VON INSASSENRÜCKMELDUNG ALS REAKTION AUF FAHREREIGNISSE VON AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGEN | [2020/17] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS TO OBTAIN PASSENGER FEEDBACK IN RESPONSE TO AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE DRIVING EVENTS | [2020/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR OBTENIR UNE RÉTROACTION DE PASSAGER EN RÉPONSE À DES ÉVÉNEMENTS DE CONDUITE DE VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 16.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2015178998 (ATTARD CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16-20 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0028] , [0053]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2017109947 (PROKHOROV DANIL V [US]) [X] 1-5,16-20 * paragraphs [0030] , [ 0033] , [0097] , [ 0098] , [0099] , [0100]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2016183525 (UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,16,20 * paragraphs [0048] , [ 0049] , [0151] , [0152] , [0153] , [0154]; figures 4, 14, 15 *; | [X]WO2016109540 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-20 * paragraphs [0053] , [0054] , [0064]; figures 6,7,9 *; | [E]WO2018139993 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [E] 1-5,13,16-20 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0030] , [0031] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 1-4 * |