EP3651864 - PORTABLE AIR TREATMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blueair AB Karlavägen 108 115 26 Stockholm / SE | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/21] | For all designated states Blueair AB Karlavägen 108 115 26 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WENNERSTRÖM, Johan c/o Blueair AB Karlavägen 108 115 26 Stockholm / SE | [2020/21] | Representative(s) | Newbould, Frazer Anthony Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/21] | Newbould, Frazer Anthony Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18740807.5 | 12.07.2018 | [2020/21] | WO2018EP68939 | Priority number, date | SE20170050927 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: SE 1750927 | [2020/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019012043 | Date: | 17.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3651864 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3651864 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A62B7/10, A62B18/00, B03C3/155, B03C3/32, B03C3/36, B03C3/41, B03C3/49 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
A62B18/006 (EP);
F24F1/04 (SE);
A62B7/10 (EP,SE);
B03C3/155 (EP);
B03C3/32 (EP);
B03C3/368 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/21] | A62B7/10, A62B18/00, B03C3/019 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARE LUFTBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/21] | English: | PORTABLE AIR TREATMENT DEVICE | [2020/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF PORTABLE D'ASSAINISSEMENT DE L'AIR | [2020/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/21] | 04.12.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2006016338 (FOLDI TIVADAR [HU]) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0027] * * figures 1, 2 *[A] 1-7,10-15; | [XA]WO2016096775 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,3,4,10,12-14 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 30 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 3 * * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 18 * * page 15, lines 17-34 * * figures 2, 5, 6 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 28 * [A] 2,5-9,11,15; | [XY]WO2017074954 (WILSON JOHN PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0059] - [0064] * * figures 1, 2, 11-16 * [Y] 8,9 |