10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
08.07.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
30.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.04.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.02.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
20.03.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
20.03.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
07.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
25.10.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
19.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|